Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10659

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:17-bk-10664
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2017
Terminated:Feb 12, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CACV of Colorado, LLC
6300 S Syracuse Way Ste 300
Centennial, CO 80111-6723
Represented By
Matthew Allen Feldman
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Paul V. Shalhoub
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, November 09, 2023
13 13 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 11/09 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Tammy L. Terrell Benoza on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Benoza, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 02/12 2:49 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
12 12 order Order, Final Decree Tue 01/21 1:40 PM
Order signed on 1/16/2020 Granting Application for Final Decree. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 12/27 6:08 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jill A. Manzo on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Manzo, Jill)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
10 10 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 06/01 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Adam J. Friedman on behalf of BSI Financial Services, Inc.. (Friedman, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
misc Terminate Attorney Thu 03/01 1:48 PM
Attorney M. Shane Johnson terminated from case per Modified Chapter 11 Plan. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 03/01 1:54 PM
Attorney Michael J. Small for CACV of Colorado, LLC added to the case per Modified Chapter 11 Plan. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
misc Terminate Attorney Wed 11/15 2:02 PM
Attorney Matthew Allen Feldman and Paul V. Shalhoub terminated from case Per Order in Lead Case # 17-10659 Doc # 158. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Wed 11/15 2:21 PM
Attorney M. Shane Johnson for CACV of Colorado, LLC added to the case per Doc # 492 in lead case # 17-10659 (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
9 9 claims Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Rule 3002.1) Wed 09/06 3:23 PM
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Rule 3002.1) with Certificate of Service. Proof of Claim NOT ON FILE filed by Nicole M Massi on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for RMAC REMIC Trust, Series 2009-5. (Massi, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, July 06, 2017
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 07/06 10:32 AM
Pending Schedules Deadlines Terminated per Confirmation of Plan (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 06/21 3:44 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole M Massi on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as Trustee for RMAC REMIC Trust, Series 2009-5.(Massi, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Thursday, May 25, 2017
utility Update Deficiency Deadlines Thu 05/25 10:02 AM
Deficiency Schedules Deadlines Updated to June 8, 2017 per Order in Case # 17-10659 Doc # 225. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
7 7 order Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Tue 03/28 9:14 AM
Order signed on 3/27/2017 Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. DEADLINE: 5/18/2017 Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, March 27, 2017
6 6 order Motion, Joint Administration Mon 03/27 2:44 PM
An order has been entered in this case on 3/27/2017 directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation, Case No. 17-10659 (JLG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 2
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Mon 03/27 11:51 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Mon 03/27 3:56 PM
Case Jointly Administered with 17-10659 (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
5 5 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 03/23 3:43 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Extending Deadline for Debtors to File their Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (B) Permanently Waiving Same Upon Confirmation of Debtors' Prepackaged Plan filed by Matthew Allen Feldman on behalf of CACV of Colorado, LLC. (Feldman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Tue 03/21 2:51 PM
Deficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 5/3/2017. Schedule A/B due 4/3/2017. Schedule D due 4/3/2017. Schedule E/F due 4/3/2017. Schedule G due 4/3/2017. Schedule H due 4/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/3/2017. List of all creditors due 4/3/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/3/2017. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 4/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 4/3/2017, (Dawes, Jeanelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Mon 03/20 10:33 AM
Motion to Extend Time / Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Extending Deadline for Debtors to File their Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (B) Permanently Waiving Same Upon Confirmation of Debtors Prepackaged Plan filed by Matthew Allen Feldman on behalf of CACV of Colorado, LLC. (Feldman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Mon 03/20 8:04 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 03/20 11:15 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10664 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 199331. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (Dawes)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Sunday, March 19, 2017
3 3 ans Declaration Sun 03/19 4:56 PM
Declaration of J.B. Richardson, Jr. in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings filed by Paul V. Shalhoub on behalf of CACV of Colorado, LLC. (Shalhoub, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Sun 03/19 4:55 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Paul V. Shalhoub on behalf of CACV of Colorado, LLC. (Shalhoub, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 03/19 4:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Matthew Allen Feldman of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP on behalf of CACV of Colorado, LLC. (Feldman, Matthew)
Related: [-]