Preferred Credit Resources Limited
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10659
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10659
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10673 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Preferred Credit Resources Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 02/12 2:54 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order, Final Decree
Tue 01/21 1:45 PM
Order signed on 1/16/2020 Granting Application for Final Decree. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Attorney
Thu 03/01 1:50 PM
Attorney M. Shane Johnson terminated from case per Modified Chapter 11 Plan. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 03/01 1:57 PM
Attorney Michael J. Small for Preferred Credit Resources Limited added to the case per Modified Chapter 11 Plan. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Terminate Attorney
Wed 11/15 2:09 PM
Attorney Matthew Allen Feldman and Paul V. Shalhoub terminated from case Per Order in Lead Case # 17-10659 Doc # 158. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Wed 11/15 2:33 PM
Attorney M. Shane Johnson for Preferred Credit Resources Limited added to the case per Doc # 492 in lead case # 17-10659 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 07/03 8:45 PM
Pending Schedules Deadlines Terminated per Confirmation of Plan. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Update Deficiency Deadlines
Thu 05/25 10:45 AM
Deficiency Schedules Deadlines Updated to June 8, 2017 per Order in Case # 17-10659 Doc # 225. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 03/28 9:39 AM
Order signed on 3/27/2017 Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. DEADLINE: 5/18/2017 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 03/27 3:39 PM
An order has been entered in this case on 3/27/2017 directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation, Case No. 17-10659 (JLG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Mon 03/27 11:51 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 03/27 4:12 PM
Case Jointly Administered with 17-10659 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Thu 03/23 3:54 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Extending Deadline for Debtors to File their Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (B) Permanently Waiving Same Upon Confirmation of Debtors' Prepackaged Plan filed by Matthew Allen Feldman on behalf of Preferred Credit Resources Limited. (Feldman, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Tue 03/21 3:26 PM
Deficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 5/3/2017. Schedule A/B due 4/3/2017. Schedule D due 4/3/2017. Schedule E/F due 4/3/2017. Schedule G due 4/3/2017. Schedule H due 4/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/3/2017. List of all creditors due 4/3/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/3/2017. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 4/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 4/3/2017, (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Mon 03/20 10:44 AM
Motion to Extend Time / Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Extending Deadline for Debtors to File their Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (B) Permanently Waiving Same Upon Confirmation of Debtors Prepackaged Plan filed by Matthew Allen Feldman on behalf of Preferred Credit Resources Limited. (Feldman, Matthew) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Mon 03/20 8:06 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 03/20 11:15 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10673 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 199331. Fee amount 1717.00. (Dawes) |
||
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Sun 03/19 5:13 PM
Declaration of J.B. Richardson, Jr. in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings filed by Paul V. Shalhoub on behalf of Preferred Credit Resources Limited. (Shalhoub, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Sun 03/19 5:12 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Paul V. Shalhoub on behalf of Preferred Credit Resources Limited. (Shalhoub, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 03/19 5:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Matthew Allen Feldman of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP on behalf of Preferred Credit Resources Limited. (Feldman, Matthew) |