Gwendolyn Hall v. Katherine Kinsey, et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-07751
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-55345 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 16, 2017 12:29 AM PST |
Defendant - Appellee
KATHERINE KINSEY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
TARA MULAY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JEAN M. COSTANZA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
A. AGUILAR
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES P. COOPER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
H. RAMIREZ
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMA KUMI THOMAS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
RONALD DAHL
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY DENTON
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
S. CHOI, Nurse, # 513708, Individual Capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
BURGUNDY COMPTON, Court Reporter, CRS 8168, Individual Capacity
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GWENDOLYN HALL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/16/2017 12:25 AM PST |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Received copy of U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit order filed on: 3 10-2017 ..... The appeal and all filings are transferred to the Ninth Circuit prusuant to 28 USC 1631.[10359816] (RT) [Entered: 03/16/2017 02:37 PM] | |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gwendolyn Hall opening brief due 06/22/2017. [10359841] (RT) [Entered: 03/16/2017 02:41 PM] | |
3 | 3 Filed Appellant Gwendolyn Hall motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/26/2017. [10360952] (LA) [Entered: 03/17/2017 11:26 AM] | |
4 | 4 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Gwendolyn Hall opening brief (Informal: Yes) of 2 pages. Served on 01/26/2017. Major deficiencies: IFP motion pending. [10360960] (LA) [Entered: 03/17/2017 11:28 AM] |