Heart Double P Land and Cattle Co., LLC
Oklahoma Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tom R Cornish |
Case #: | 7:17-bk-80258 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Debtor
Heart Double P Land and Cattle Co., LLC
PO Box 957
Muldrow, OK 74948-0957 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Charles Greenough
Charles Greenough, Trustee 2 W Second St Ste 1100
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Office of the Assistant U.S. Trustee 224 S Boulder Ste 225
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Docket last updated: 03/20/2017 12:04 PM CDT |
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
caseupld
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload
Sun 03/19 3:41 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Individual filed by Terry D. Bigby on behalf of Heart Double P Land and Cattle Co., LLC. (Bigby, Terry) |
|
2 | 2
caseupld
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor(caseupload)
Sun 03/19 3:41 PM
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor(s) filed by Terry D. Bigby on behalf of Heart Double P Land and Cattle Co., LLC. (Bigby, Terry) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Sun 03/19 3:45 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload 17-80258 [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 2762391. Fee Amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Sun 03/19 3:46 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/03/2017 at 11:00 AM at Third Floor, Room 306, UST 341 Meeting, US Post Office & Courthouse, 4th & Grand Okmulgee OK 74447. (Bigby, Terry) |