OSEI v. SPIVEY et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Referred: | Stephen Hyles |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00063 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 5:08 AM EDT |
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
|
|
Petitioner
JOSEPH OSEI
A 209-166-253 STEWART DETENTION CENTER PO BOX 248
LUMPKIN, GA 31815 |
|
Respondent
ICE Asst Director JOHN BRETZ
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Secretary DHS JEH C JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Attorney General JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden BILL SPIVEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 09/04 5:07 PM
Mail Returned -17 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Report and Recommendations,18 Judgment sent to petitioner returned as No Longer Here (tlf) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Thu 08/23 2:30 PM
JUDGMENT adopting the report and recommendation to dismiss this action (tlf) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/23 1:18 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; adopting15 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 8/22/2018 (tlf) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/17 10:31 AM
Mail Returned -15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, JOHN BRETZ, JEH C JOHNSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) sent to PETITIONER returned as undeliverable. [NO LONGER HERE] (tlp) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 07/24 10:09 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7/24/18. (AGH) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/20 1:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN BRETZ, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) filed by JOSEPH D HARDY.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Agency Declaration | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/19 10:21 AM
STATUS REPORT by JOHN BRETZ, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)(HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Removal Order - 9/7/2017 | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/10 1:43 PM
ORDER for Respondents to provide status update within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-10-18. (bdd) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 01/08 4:42 PM
Letter from clerk responding to10 Letter (tlf) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Mon 01/08 12:18 PM
Letter from petitioner regarding status of case(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Response in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion
Fri 05/19 1:10 PM
REPLY in Opposition re8 RESPONSE in Opposition(tlp) |
|
Att: 1 Homeland Security and Immigration Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion
Mon 04/24 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DO declaration with tabs | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/29 9:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOSEPH D HARDY on behalf of JOHN BRETZ, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY Attorney JOSEPH D HARDY added to party JOHN BRETZ(pty:res), Attorney JOSEPH D HARDY added to party JEH C JOHNSON(pty:res), Attorney JOSEPH D HARDY added to party JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III(pty:res), Attorney JOSEPH D HARDY added to party BILL SPIVEY(pty:res) (HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
6 | 6
respoth
Return Response (28:2241)
Wed 03/29 1:18 PM
RETURN RESPONSE re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOHN BRETZ, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) (HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/29 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOSEPH D HARDY on behalf of All Defendants (HARDY, JOSEPH) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Mon 03/27 5:06 PM
ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOSEPH OSEI. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/27/2017. (efw) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Mon 03/20 2:56 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOSEPH OSEI (tlp) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 2:55 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/20 2:54 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ,filed by JOSEPH OSEI. ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 41612.)(tlp) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |