Hudgins v. Golden Manor Apartments
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rudy Lozano |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00121 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 6:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Golden Manor Apartments
Office Workers Manager and Owner's 1201 West 175th
Hammond, IN 46324 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Gerald M Bishop
2115 West Lincoln Highway
Merrillville, IN 46410 |
|
Plaintiff
Billy Hudgins
7531 Whitcomb Street
Merrillville, IN 46410 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Wed 12/13 12:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Golden Manor Apartments. (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Wed 12/13 3:00 PM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and per28 Stipulation. (mc) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 11/17 1:47 PM
ORDER: Dismissal Papers due by 12/18/2017. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/17/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb) |
|
26 | 26
adr
Report of Mediation
Fri 11/17 11:51 AM
Final REPORT of Mediation indicating SETTLEMENT by Gerald M Bishop.(Bishop, Gerald) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
discov
Disclosure
Mon 10/02 5:05 PM
Pre-Discovery DISCLOSURES filed by Billy Hudgins. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 09/26 4:53 PM
NOTICE by Gerald M Bishop of Acceptance of Appointment as Mediator and Scheduling of a Mediation Session on November 16, 2017 (Bishop, Gerald) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Disclosure
Thu 08/03 3:23 PM
Pre-Discovery Disclosures (FRCP 26(A)(1) by Billy Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 07/11 12:39 PM
NOTICE by Golden Manor Apartments Selection of Mediator (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
discov
Discovery
Wed 07/05 3:25 PM
Plaintiff's DISCOVERY - Subpoena to Produce Documents by Billy Hudgins. (nal) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Disclosure
Thu 06/22 1:32 PM
Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Defendant Golden Manor Apartments. (Rygg, Jonathan) Modified on 6/22/2017 to modify text/term motion as it was filed using motion event(smb) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Thu 06/08 4:18 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 26-2(2)(A) all discovery including notices and responses shall be filed with the Court in this case. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/8/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Thu 06/08 4:16 PM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/8/2017, before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by in person w/o counsel. Dft appeared by atty Jonathan Rygg via telephone. Court explains to Plaintiff procedures in Federal Court and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules to be followed which are found on the Court's website, www.innd.uscourts.gov. The Report filed as DE17 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/23/2017. The last date to seek leave to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 8/24/2017 by Pltf; 9/22/2017 by Dft. The last date to complete all non-expert discovery and discovery related to liability issues is 2/28/2018. Any expert discovery and discovery related to damages to be completed by 5/31/2018. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/20/2018. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/21/2018. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 6/22/2018. Mediator Selection Deadline is 7/7/2017. Mediation to be completed by 11/30/2017. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. cc: Hudgins (Tape #FTR GOLD.) (tc) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Fri 06/02 10:52 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/26 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Orelup on behalf of Golden Manor Apartments (Orelup, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/26 10:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Manor Apartments identifying Corporate Parent Golden Manor Apartments, L.P. for Golden Manor Apartments.. (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/26 10:11 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Golden Manor Apartments.(Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 05/05 3:45 PM
Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2017 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. (copy to pro se Plaintiff) (mr) Modified on 5/5/2017 (mr) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 05/03 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court on its own motion RESETS the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2017 at 11:30 am Central time to a telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 6/8/2017 at 11:30 am Eastern time. Court to initiate call. Change in time only. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/3/2017. (copy to pro se party) (mr) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 05/03 12:43 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/3/2017. (copy to pro se party)(smb) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Wed 05/03 12:36 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb) (copy to pro se party) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/03 12:36 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2017 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 6/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/3/2017. (copy to pro se party)(smb) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rudy Lozano for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/26 12:17 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended through 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/26/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/25 3:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Pro Se Complaint by Defendant Golden Manor Apartments. (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Miles Rygg on behalf of All Defendants (Rygg, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/11 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Billy Hudgins. Golden Manor Apartments served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 8:25 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Golden Manor Apartments. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS). (cer) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/28 8:18 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Billy Hudgins. Payment of the filing fee is DEFERRED. Plaintiff ORDERED to pay the filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case. United States Marshal's Service DIRECTED to effect service of process on Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/27/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party; USMS).(cer) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Billy Hudgins. (jss) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Mon 03/20 3:06 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Golden Manor Apartments, filed by Billy Hudgins.(jss) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 USM Form |