Misty Chaney Brady
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41120 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing held
Mon 12/10 2:16 PM
Hearing held on 12/10/2018. ***GRANTED*** (Rueter, Karyn) |
||
court
Hearing held
Mon 12/10 2:16 PM
Hearing held on 12/10/2018. ***GRANTED*** (Rueter, Karyn) |
||
court
Hearing held
Mon 12/10 2:28 PM
Hearing held on 12/10/2018. ***GRANTED*** (Rueter, Karyn) |
||
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
391 | 391
motion
Expedite hearing
Thu 12/06 4:36 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Consolidated debtor BP Chaney, LLC, Texas RHH, LLC, Debtor Misty Chaney Brady (Hayward, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
390 | 390
motion
Substitute attorney
Thu 12/06 4:34 PM
Motion to substitute attorney Gregory W. Mitchell and The Mitchell Law Firm, LP with Melissa Hayward and the law firm of Hayward & Associates PLLC Filed by Consolidated debtor BP Chaney, LLC, Texas RHH, LLC, Debtor Misty Chaney Brady (Hayward, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
389 | 389
order
Assume/Reject
Mon 12/03 3:06 PM
Order denying motion to assume and assign executory contract or unexpired lease Entered on 12/3/2018. (McCrory, J.) |
|
388 | 388
court
Hearing set/continued
Mon 12/03 2:09 PM
Hearing reset Hearing to be held on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for354 , (Calfee, J.) |
|
387 | 387
order
Reconsider
Mon 12/03 1:17 PM
Order denying motion to reconsider Entered on 12/3/2018. (McCrory, J.) |