Caples v. Myers et al (INMATE 3)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | W Harold Albritton, III |
Referred: | Gray M Borden |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00154 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Defendant
Steven T. Marshall
|
|
Defendant
Walter Myers
|
|
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Scott Caples
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/18 11:14 AM
ORDERED that (1) The2 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and (2) This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 2241(d). Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/18/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 04/18 11:15 AM
Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; Entire file with certified copies of docket sheet and transfer order sent ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 04/11 2:28 PM
No objections filed to the2 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/21 3:23 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under the provisions of 28 USC 2241(d); Objections to R&R due by 4/4/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 3/21/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/20 8:54 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph Scott Caples. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE)(alm, ) |