Adams v. Coles County Jail et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | James E Shadid |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02062 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 06/20 10:34 AM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 6/20/2018. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the December 4, 2017 CaseManagement Order dismissing his lawsuit is denied.22 2) Plaintiff's multiple motions for a status update or ruling on his motion are denied as moot. [23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28] SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (SAG, ilcd) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/15 11:26 AM
MOTION for Ruling by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 6/29/2018 (JS, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/17 12:15 PM
URGENT MOTION for Ruling Update on Pending Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative Appeal Based on Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59(e) FRCP 59(e) by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 5/31/2018 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/25 11:25 AM
MOTION for Ruling Update on Pending Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative Appeal by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 5/9/2018 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/06 11:05 AM
MOTION for Status Update by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 4/20/2018 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/15 1:01 PM
MOTION for Status Update for Pending Motion for Reconsideration or Appeal by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 3/29/2018 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/08 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines22 MOTION for Reconsideration: Responses due by 1/18/2018. (ddl reset as terminated in error) (JRK, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/31 2:47 PM
MOTION for Status Update on22 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 2/14/2018 (JRK, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Reconsideration
Thu 01/04 3:00 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration or Notice of Appeal re17 by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 1/18/2018(VH, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 01/02 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 1/2/18. The Court has received a document entitled Motion to Reconsider which is two pages long.21 The first page is from Menard Correctional Center and indicates Plaintiff's filing exceeds 100 pages and therefore it was not e-filed. Instead, the motion was mailed to the Clerk of the Court. Since the Court has not yet received the complete document, the motion is denied.21 The Court will consider the complete motion to reconsider after it is received and docketed by the Clerk's Office.(FDS, ilcd) |
||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 12/29 10:23 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 1/12/2018(VH, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Motion for Reconsideration | ||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/08 12:41 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 12/8/2017. Plaintiff's motion for a status update is denied.20 A merit review order was entered on December 4, 2017.17 (VH, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/07 12:49 PM
MOTION for Status of Merit Review by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 12/21/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 12/07 12:10 PM
**STRICKEN** Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 24626007381. (TC, ilcd) Modified on 12/7/17 to show "**STRICKEN**" as filed in wrong case (TC, ilcd) |
||
order
Order
Thu 12/07 12:12 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 12/7/17 striking "Filing Fee paid" entry of 12/7/17 as it was docketed in incorrect case. (TC, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Judgment
Wed 12/06 10:00 AM
JUDGMENT entered. (VH, ilcd) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/04 2:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by John K Adams.(VH, ilcd) |
|
17 | 17
order
Prisoner Merit Review Opinion Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 12/04 2:01 PM
MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 12/4/2017. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted.15 . 2) Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A and for failure to follow Court orders. This case is closed. All pending motions are denied as moot. [16, status]. 3) This dismissal shall count as one of the Plaintiff's three allotted strikes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). The Clerk of the Court is directed to record the Plaintiff's strike in the three-strike log and note Plaintiff now has three strikes. 4) In any future litigation concerning prison conditions in which Plaintiff seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff MUST inform the Court in writing of his three strikes status pursuant to §1915(g). 5) If the Plaintiff wishes to appeal this dismissal, he may file a notice of appeal with this court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a). A motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis MUST set forth the issues the Plaintiff plans to present on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1)(C). If the Plaintiff does choose to appeal, he will be liable for the $505 appellate filing fee irrespective of the outcome of the appeal. 6) If Plaintiff continues to file multiple lawsuits repeating allegations, he could face sanctions up to and including an order that all papers he tenders to the Clerk of the Court be returned unfiled until he pays all outstanding fees in all civil actions he has filed. See full written Order. (VH, ilcd) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 11/03 9:02 AM
MOTION for Status on Merit Review by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 11/17/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/29 10:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 10/13/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Request Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/11 9:50 AM
MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 9/11/2017. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Based on a review of Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915A, Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed pursuant to Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Plaintiff has not clearly identified his intended claims, it appears he is attempting to combine several unrelated claims against different defendants in one lawsuit, and it appears most, if not all, of his claims are barred by the two year statute of limitations period. 2) If Plaintiff believes he can state a constitutional violation which is not time barred, he may file an amended complaint within 21 days of this order. The Clerk is to provide Plaintiff with a complaint form to assist him. Plaintiff must use the complaint form and list his previous litigation and must follow the directions provided in this order. If Plaintiff does not file his amended complaint by the deadline and does not follow the Courts directions, his case will be dismissed. 3) If Plaintiff does not believe he has any surviving claims or does not believe he exhausted his administrative remedies for any surviving claims, he may file a motion to voluntarily dismiss his case within 21 days (10/2/2017) and the Court will dismiss this lawsuit and waive the filing fee. 4) Plaintiff's motions for a status update are denied as moot. [8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13 ]. Plaintiff is admonished he must not file repetitive motions or he could face sanctions including fines. 5) Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied with leave to renew after he clarifies his claims.5 5) The Clerk of the Court is to set an internal merit review deadline in 30 days (10/11/2017) of this order.See full written Order.(VH, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Blank Complaint | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/05 10:47 AM
MOTION for Initial Merit Review by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 9/19/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/28 10:17 AM
MOTION for Status Update by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 9/11/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/09 1:38 PM
MOTION for Status by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 8/23/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/10 1:31 PM
MOTION for Status Update by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 7/24/2017 (RK, ilcd) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/23 10:26 AM
MOTION for Status Update by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 7/7/2017(VH, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/02 11:37 AM
MOTION for Status Update (filed in letter format) by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 6/16/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/09 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 5/9/17. Plaintiff has filed a motion for a status update.7 Plaintiff notes after he transferred from Pontiac to Menard, he received notice that his case was closed. Plaintiff says he has never received a prior notice of dismissal. Plaintiff is mistaken. The Court noted it had received Plaintiffs address change in this case, and as a courtesy, was updating the address in all his cases including his closed cases. This case remains open pending merit review. The motion is denied as moot.7 (FDT, ilcd) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/08 1:21 PM
MOTION for Status by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 5/22/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 04/26 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John K Adams. Plaintiff has be transferred to Menard CC. (VH, ilcd) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Request Counsel
Mon 03/20 3:51 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff John K Adams. Responses due by 4/3/2017 (VH, ilcd) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Mon 03/20 3:46 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by John K Adams (VH, ilcd) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:45 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by John K Adams.(VH, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Opening
Mon 03/20 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/10/2017.(VH, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 NOTICE REGARDING PRIVACY ISSUES | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John K Adams.(VH, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:47 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/20/2017. (VH, ilcd) |