Torres v. Sensible Portions, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Wells Roby |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02291 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sensible Portions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael T. Torres
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 09/19 12:55 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/18/2017. (caa) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 09/18 11:30 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case with prejudice . Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (cml) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 09/14 1:51 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case with prejudice by Michael T. Torres. (Bell, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 07/12 11:07 AM
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/11/2017.(tm) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Consent/Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/11 10:44 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction and Order referring case to US Magistrate Judge. Judge Jay C. Zainey terminated. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/10/2017.(ajn) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/12 11:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2018 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. All discovery must be completed by 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/11/2017.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 06/15 12:06 PM
ORDER: The9 Rule16/Preliminary Conference Order is RESCHEDULED for 7/10/2017 01:30 PM before the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cml) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 06/09 3:30 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Conference shall be conducted before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on June 22, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. in Room B437 of the Hale Boggs Federal Building, 500 Poydras Street, New Orleans, La. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/9/2017.(clc) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/05 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michael T. Torres served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017. (Bell, Paul) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/19 4:59 PM
Defenses and ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sensible Portions, Inc..Attorney Robert Craig Stern added to party Sensible Portions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Stern, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 10:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Sensible Portions, Inc. (ajn) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/20 10:12 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re2 Summons Submitted for Issuance,3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted. ***Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons and the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action is necessary*** (ajn) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 9:28 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (djg) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet Submitted
Mon 03/20 7:28 AM
Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Bell, Paul) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/20/2017) (ajn) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Mon 03/20 7:26 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Bell, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/20/2017) (ajn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 7:24 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sensible Portions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6032192) filed by Michael T Torres.Attorney Paul F. Bell added to party Michael T Torres(pty:pla).(Bell, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |