Stewart v. Dallas County Jail
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00770 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Defendant
Dallas County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
NFN Norwood
|
|
Defendant
NFN Shelton
|
|
Plaintiff
Terence Alex Stewart
|
|
Plaintiff
Terence Stewart
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 07/12 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Terence Stewart. New address: 9350 Skillman St, Apt 123, Dallas, Tx 75243. (ykp) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Wed 05/31 3:20 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The plaintiff may not re-file this action, or any other civil action to which the Prison Litigation Reform Act applies, without prepaying the requisite filing fees or making a showing of imminent danger of serious physical injury. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/31/2017) (ykp) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 05/31 3:07 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/31/2017) (ykp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/31 3:22 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17. Wed May 31 15:22:06 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Mail Returned
Wed 05/24 2:19 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.11 Findings and Recommendations on Case re:8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis3 Complaint filed by Terence Stewart. received back from Terence Stewart as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Released. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Findings and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 05/12 9:26 AM
Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Before the Court is the plaintiff's amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, received 5/11/2017 (doc.13 ), with the required certificate of inmate trust account. The pending Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, received 4/7/2017 (doc.8 ), is DEEMED MOOT. Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the case should still be summarily DISMISSED as barred by the "three-strikes" rule of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) unless the plaintiff timely pays the filing fee. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/12/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 05/12 9:26 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri May 12 09:26:43 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/11 4:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terence Stewart. (twd) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/08 12:13 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon May 8 12:13:52 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 05/05 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Terence Stewart. New address: Terrell State Hospital, 1200 E Brin St, Terrell, TX 75160. (svc) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 04/17 8:44 AM
Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis should be DENIED, and his claims should be summarily DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) unless he pays the full $400 filing fee prior to acceptance of this recommendation or before a deadline otherwise established by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/17/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/17 8:44 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Apr 17 08:44:19 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/14 11:28 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dallas County Sheriff's Department, NFN Norwood, NFN Shelton filed by Terence Stewart. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/10 8:45 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Terence Stewart must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis with required Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/10/2017) (aaa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/10 8:45 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Apr 10 08:45:30 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/07 12:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terence Stewart. (axm) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/06 7:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Apr 6 07:58:12 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 04/06 7:57 AM
ORDER: The plaintiff's non-compliant6 motion is DENIED without prejudice to filing an amended complaint that names the correct defendant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/5/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 Original Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 1983 Form | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 04/04 3:33 PM
MOTION to Correct Name on3 Complaint filed by Terence Stewart. (twd) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Tue 03/21 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Terence Stewart must address the following deficiency: The application does not provide enough information to decide if in forma pauperis status is appropriate because it does not include the certificate of inmate trust account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/21/2017) (twd) |
|
Att: 1 MIFP form | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/21 11:19 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Mar 21 11:19:05 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/20 11:04 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Mar 20 11:04:45 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 11:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Terence Stewart. (aaa) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Dallas County Sheriff's Department, NFN Norwood, NFN Shelton filed by Terence Stewart. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Mon 03/20 11:02 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Lynn
Mon 03/20 11:01 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) |