Gonzales v. Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00215 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Family & Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/02 5:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) and by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 12/18 9:26 AM
ORDER for Settlement Papers re29 Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome
Fri 12/15 12:18 PM
Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Settled during ADR/Mediation. Amount of fee: $$1,200.00. (Holland, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 12/11 5:07 PM
ORDER, ( Discovery due by 2/8/2018,, Motions due by 3/5/2018,), Motions terminated:27 Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Joint) filed by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC, Willie Gonzales.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 12/11 3:45 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf) |
||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 12/11 3:47 PM
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE PLAINTIFF HAS BEEN ADDED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT**** re27 Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Joint) . (rf) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 12/08 1:11 PM
Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Joint) by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.(Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
trial
Exhibit List
Tue 10/10 11:06 AM
Exhibit List by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 09/25 10:47 AM
Exhibit List by Willie Gonzales.. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 09/22 2:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/8/2017, Motions due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 09/21 4:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) and by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.(Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/01 3:40 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.(Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/28 4:06 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/21 2:11 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) and by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/09 3:45 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) and by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
trial
Expert Witness List
Tue 08/08 3:01 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/31 10:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC filed by Willie Gonzales.(aej) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 07/31 7:45 AM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint in light of16 Defendant's Non-Opposition. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tc) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Fri 07/28 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC re14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
trial
Expert Witness List
Wed 07/26 11:10 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Willie Gonzales. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/20 5:11 PM
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Willie Gonzales. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
13 | 13
adr
ADR Report - Other
Thu 07/20 10:36 AM
ADR Report Filed - by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) and by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC(Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 07/13 3:37 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/13 3:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 7/20/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2017, Discovery due by 9/22/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2017, Motions due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Protective Order
Wed 07/12 2:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Willie Gonzales (Cammack, Thomas) by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.(Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Protective Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Advisory to the Court
Thu 05/25 11:48 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (Applebaum, Raven) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency Notice
Mon 04/24 11:14 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND ATTORNEY SIGNATURE*** re 5 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge (aej) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Supplement
Fri 04/21 3:05 PM
SUPPLEMENT to5 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge (CORRECTED) by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (de Leon, Lara) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 04/21 2:51 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (de Leon, Lara) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 2:26 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC. (de Leon, Lara) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Wed 03/22 10:20 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra (aej) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/21 1:56 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Willie Gonzales. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 12:25 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Willie Gonzales. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9408352), filed by Inmate Calling Solutions, LLC.(de Leon, Lara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 2:08 PM
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 03/20 2:09 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (aej) |