Doe v. Arizona Senate
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00822 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:35 AM MST |
Defendant
Arizona Senate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talonya Adams
PO Box 25401
Phoenix, AZ 85002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
418 | 418
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 10/27 11:37 AM
ORDER granting417 Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal of Counsel with Consent. Attorneys N. Todd McKay and John M. Fry of the Office of the Arizona Attorney General shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Arizona Senate. Defendant Arizona Senate shall continue to be represented by Andrea G. Lovell and Kristy L. Peters of Littler Mendelson PC. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/26/2022. (RMV) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2022 | ||
417 | 417
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/25 4:10 PM
EX PARTE First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Consent by Arizona Senate.(McKay, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order |