Culp #232028 v. Henry
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Referred: | James F Metcalf |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00827 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 10/22 8:42 AM
Filing fee: $227.54, receipt number PHX232654. PAID IN FULL. (SMH) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 10/03 4:14 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed October 3, 2017, which granted the Motion for Summary Judgment, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (REK) |
|
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 10/03 4:10 PM
ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment14 , and the Motion is granted. The action is terminated without prejudice for failure to exhaust the available administrative remedies, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/03/2017. (REK) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 08/29 9:54 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Stay Discovery. Any stayed discovery responses will be due 30 days after a ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.14 ). The following deadlines are VACATED, to be reset by further order upon: the joint discovery planning meeting; the joint case management report; service of discovery requests; discovery motions; and dispositive motions; filing of all other pretrial motions. In all other respects, the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc.11 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 8/29/17.(DXD) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Wed 08/09 8:17 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff shall have through 9/14/2017 within which to file a response to14 MOTION for Summary Judgment together with a separate Statement of Facts in support of his response. Defendants shall have 15 days following service of the response in which to file a reply. The Motion for Summary Judgment will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for following a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 8/8/17. (DXD) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stay
Mon 08/07 2:58 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Continue Deadlines by Adam Henry.(Dylo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
misc
Statement of Facts
Mon 08/07 8:01 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re:14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Adam Henry.(Dylo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 08/07 8:00 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Adam Henry. (Dylo, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Tue 08/01 4:52 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 8/1/17.(DXD) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/28 10:26 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew Culp. (SLQ) (1 page) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/18 3:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/6/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/19/2017. The parties shall submit to the Court their Joint Case Management Report on or before 8/31/2017. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 7/18/2017. (ATD) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/14 3:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Adam Henry.(Gottfried, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 06/20 4:30 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: summons/complaint/order upon Adam Henry on 6/19/17. (LAD) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Remark re Docs Received for Service
Wed 05/31 9:22 AM
Prisoner documents received: AO 398 received electronically on 5/26/17 for Defendant Adam Henry; Service packet documents were already received for Defendant Adam Henry and forwarded to the USMS on 4/10/2017. (ATD) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)
Mon 04/10 3:06 PM
Service Packet Forwarded to USMS. USM 285 Summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to Defendant Adam Henry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 03/22 12:49 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Andrew Culp. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/17. (LAD) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/22 12:41 PM
ORDER (Service Packet) granting Plaintiff's2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff this Order, and a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendant Henry. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/22/17. (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Copy of Service Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Samples and Service Forms | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Mon 03/20 11:48 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (DXD) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 03/20 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (DXD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 03/20 11:45 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Andrew Culp (9 pages). (DXD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 11:45 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Andrew Culp (2 pages). (DXD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:44 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Culp (6 pages). (DXD) |