Carla Allison v. Sodexo, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02162 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sodexo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Carla Allison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 3:17 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:17-cv-00508 JVS (DFMx). (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc., (Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE Of Related Cases filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 3:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc. identifying Sodexo, S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Mon 03/20 3:35 PM
DECLARATION of Shoshana Chazan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 3:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017 00899330 Receipt No: 0973-19543367 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer Yanni added to party Sodexo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yanni, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint |