Leonard Allen Songer v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Frederick F Mumm |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02172 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Attorney Fees
Thu 02/06 4:38 PM
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. §406(b) by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting24 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Based on the foregoing considerations, the Court finds and concludes that $24,000 in fees is reasonable. The petition for attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b) is granted. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Statement (Motion related)
Wed 08/14 4:33 PM
STATEMENT of Commissioners Non-Party Analysis of Plaintiffs Counsels 406(b) Fee Request / NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 42 U.S.C. § 406(B); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Denise Bourgeois Haley 24 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 08/05 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 42 U.S.C. § 406(B); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Denise Bourgeois Haley filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer. (Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Wed 10/03 4:46 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees22 . IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $4,150.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and costs in the amount of $417.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Tue 10/02 4:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $4150. filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 06/29 5:28 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Order dated June 29, 2018. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jm) |
|
20 | 20
order
Remand Case to US Agency
Fri 06/29 5:26 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm Remanding Case: (see attached) For all of the foregoing reasons, the decision of the Administrative Law Judge is reversed and this matter remanded for further proceedings consistent with this decision. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jm) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Fri 12/15 5:07 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/16 3:15 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include October 30, 2017. (See document for further details.) re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File,17 . (sbou) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/06 3:14 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File send portion of the joint stipulation to defendant filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer.(Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Leonard Allen Songer(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/07 3:42 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File15 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include September 25, 2017, in which to send Plaintiff's portion of the Joint Stipulation; and that all other deadlines set forth in the March 24, 2017 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. The parties shall file the completed Joint Stipulation on or before November 20, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jm) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 09/06 6:24 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File send portion of the joint stipulation to defendant filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 07/17 9:53 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/17 9:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/05 10:14 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2172 FFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 10:49 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 04/07 10:21 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Haley, Denise) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Fri 04/07 10:12 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/5/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Haley, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 03/24 8:21 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: (see attached) (jm) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:18 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (jm) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 5:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer. (Haley, Denise) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer, (Haley, Denise) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 5:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer. (Haley, Denise) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19545050 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Leonard Allen Songer. (Attorney Denise Bourgeois Haley added to party Leonard Allen Songer(pty:pla))(Haley, Denise) |