Jose Amador Jacobo v. King Taco Restaurant, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02178 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
King Taco Restaurant, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jose Amador Jacobo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
King Taco Restaurant, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Amador Jacobo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 09/06 7:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. DKT.24 (ake) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Settlement
Tue 09/05 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to the Entire Case Including Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Jose Amador Jacobo. (Kim, Sung) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 08/07 8:10 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Scheduling Conference set for October 23, 2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report due October 13, 2017. (ah) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Counterclaim
Thu 08/03 3:42 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Jose Amador Jacobo, filed by defendant King Taco Restaurant, Inc..(Rosen, Frank) |
|
21 | 21
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Thu 08/03 9:11 AM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Claim20 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. The docket text states that a Claim was filed. However, the document filed is a Counterclaim. The title of the document and docket text do not match. Because the correct event codes were not used, the parties were not added to the docket. Counsel shall refile the document using the correct event codes by August 3, 2017. The parties shall be added to the docket properly. (ah) |
|
20 | 20
respoth
Claim
Thu 08/03 12:32 AM
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT.21 )CLAIM filed by counter claiment King Taco Restaurant, Inc.. (Rosen, Frank) Modified on 8/3/2017 (ah) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/03 12:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant King Taco Restaurant, Inc..(Rosen, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Tue 08/01 10:07 AM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answer to Complaint15 , Answer to Complaint16 , for the following reasons: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry 15. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order, all initiating pleadings including COUNTERCLAIMS shall be filed as a separate document. Docket Entry 16 is both an Answer and a Counterclaim. Defendant shall file the Answer and the Counterclaim correctly by no later than 8/2/17. (pso) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/31 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant King Taco Restaurant, Inc., identifying king taco restaurant.\, inc.. (Rosen, Frank) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/31 2:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by King Taco Restaurant, Inc. King Taco Restaurant, Inc..(Rosen, Frank) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/31 12:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by King Taco Restaurant, Inc. King Taco Restaurant, Inc..(Attorney Frank P Rosen added to party King Taco Restaurant, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rosen, Frank) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/26 8:41 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than August 2, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 07/24 5:11 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo, upon Defendant King Taco Restaurant, Inc. served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Gonzalez, Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Sung) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/29 10:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (DKT. 10) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response to Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution (Dkt.11 ), in response to the Order to Show Cause ("OSC") and continues the OSC to July 24, 2017. No further continuances will be granted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 06/28 4:03 PM
OPPOSITION Response to OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution [ECF No. 10] filed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo. (Kim, Sung) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/21 9:13 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than June 28, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In the absence of showing good cause, an action shall be dismissed if the summons and complaint have not been served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). An action may be dismissed prior to such time if the Plaintiff fails diligently to prosecute the action. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint and/or proof(s) of service, which indicates proper service in full compliance with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 2:51 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 03/22 3:20 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to defendant King Taco Restaurant, Inc. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo, (Kim, Sung) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo. (Kim, Sung) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 10:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo. (Kim, Sung) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19545834 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jose Amador Jacobo. (Attorney Sung T Kim added to party Jose Amador Jacobo(pty:pla))(Kim, Sung) |