Carlos V. Farias v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00524 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Quicken Loans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos V. Farias
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Receipt
Fri 05/05 12:45 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Tue 04/18 8:08 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court - Civil Division. (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Remand Case to State Court ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 04/06 2:53 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; ORDER STAYING REMAND ORDER UNTIL APRIL 11, 2017 by Judge John F. Walter: the Court hereby REMANDS this action to San Bernardino County Superior Court. The Court STAYS this Order until 4/11/2017. Because Plaintiff originally filed this action in San Bernardino County Superior Court, the Court assumes that Plaintiff does not object to the remand of this action. However, in the unlikely event Plaintiff wishes to remain in federal court and thereby waive the procedural defect discussed above, Plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing on or before 4/11/2017. If Plaintiff instead prefers that this action be remanded to state court, Plaintiff may simply decline to file a waiver of the procedural defect. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 04/03 12:13 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING DOES by Judge John F. Walter: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. (jp) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 03/30 4:40 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3)9 by Judge John F. Walter that the Stipulation be GRANTED. The Court ORDERS that the new deadline for Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., to respond to the initial Complaint is 4/26/2017. (jp) |
|
11 | 11
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 4:11 PM
Text Entry Order: Order to Show Cause 10 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/29 3:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND/OR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULES: The Court, hereby orders defendant to show cause in writing no later than 4:00 p.m. on March 30, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed and/or sanctions imposed for failure to comply with the Central District of Californias Local Rule 5-4.5. As an alternative to a written response, the Court will consider as an adequate response to the Courts Order to Show Cause the delivery of the required Mandatory Chambers Copies of all case opening documents to Judge Walters Mandatory Chambers drop box by 4:00 p.m. on March 30, 2017. Counsel is reminded delivery of courtesy copies should be made to the new Courthouse located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, Courtroom 7A. Counsel has also failed to deliver courtesy copies of the Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer9 or emailed the proposed order to chambers. Continued failure to comply with the Court's Standing Order and local rules will result in the termination of this case.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 3/29/2017 (sr) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 03/27 8:03 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quicken Loans, Inc. answer now due 4/26/2017, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc..(Kruger, Kristine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 03/22 10:51 AM
COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for May 15, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 1, 2017. (jloz) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 03/22 10:50 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jloz) |
|
6 | 6
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/22 10:37 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on March 23, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-524 JFW (DTBx). (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., a Michigan corporation, (Kruger, Kristine) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 6:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Kruger, Kristine) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1701971 Receipt No: 0973-19545323 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc., a Michigan corporation. (Attorney Kristine Elizabeth Kruger added to party Quicken Loans, Inc., a Michigan corporation(pty:dft))(Kruger, Kristine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 1:51 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Quicken Loans, Inc.Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Carlos V. Farias. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/3/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) |