Arthur Lopez v. Newport Beach Police Department et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie Baker Fairbank |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Newport Beach
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Connor Miller
|
|
Defendant
Newport Beach Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Josh Vincelet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Lopez
2251 Bloomfield Lane
Corona, CA 92882 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
93 | 93
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 02/28 4:17 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals81 , CCA # 18-56452 The judgment of this Court, entered February 06, 2020, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum92 , AFFIRMED.] (mat) |