Alan Atchison v. Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00498 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ashley Distribution Services, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Alan Atchison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 11:41 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:17-cv-00528 JGB (SPx). (esa) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/20 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Ashley Distribution Services, LTD. Related Case(s): none (Hart, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ashley Distribution Services, LTD, identifying Plaintiff Alan Atchison; Ashley Distribution Services, Ltd.; erroneous designation as named defendant, Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Hart, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 5:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ashley Distribution Services, LTD. (Hart, James) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIV DS1702285 Receipt No: 0973-19545155 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ashley Distribution Services, LTD. (Attorney James E Hart added to party Ashley Distribution Services, LTD(pty:dft))(Hart, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Summons, Certificate of Assignment, Notice of Case Assignment, Civil Case Cover Sheet), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Answer to Complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of William Kraus In Support of Defendant's Notice to Federal Court of Removal of Civil Action from State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§1332, 1441, 1446, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Troy Muller In Support of Defendant's Notice to Federal Court of Removal of Civil Action from State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§1332, 1441, 1446 |