Elizabeth Ann Grimes v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00499 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago |
Saturday, January 23, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
order
Attorney Fees
Mon 01/25 9:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES36 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Fri 11/06 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To 42 U.S.C. § 406(B); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; And Declaration Of Steven G. Rosales 36 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 10/26 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TOPLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Defendant is directed to file a response to the Motion within fourteen (14) days. Plaintiff's counsel may file a reply to defendant's response within seven (7) days of service thereof. Absent further order of the court, the Motion will be deemed submitted for decision on the date on which plaintiff's counsel's reply is due.36 (klg) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 10/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To 42 U.S.C. § 406(B); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; And Declaration Of Steven G. Rosales filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Mon 03/18 4:32 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Fees awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $ 3000.00 and no costs. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees34 . (sbou) |
|
34 | 34
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Mon 03/18 11:34 AM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3000. filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Stay Case
Wed 01/09 7:10 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: denying32 APPLICATION to Stay Case (rrey) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stay Case
Wed 01/09 6:32 AM
APPLICATION to Stay Case filed by defendant United States of America (rrey) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 01/02 9:34 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, in favor of Elizabeth Ann Grimes against Nancy A. Berryhill Related to: Memorandum & Opinion,30 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and the matter is remanded for further administrative action consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order of Remand filed concurrently herewith. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
30 | 30
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 01/02 9:32 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is REVERSED in part, and this matter is REMANDED for further administrative action consistent with this Opinion. (See document for details.) (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 04/10 4:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Motion Related Document
Tue 02/20 2:15 PM
CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Social Security Complaint 24 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Extension of Time to File
Mon 01/22 1:25 PM
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request to modify briefing schedule is granted and that plaintiff's deadline to file a motion for summary judgment is extended to January 19, 2018. Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment is now due February 19, 2018.25 (klg) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 01/19 1:58 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/19 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Social Security Complaint filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/22 11:43 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File22 . Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including December 29, 2017, in which to prepare and file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; defendant's brief in opposition is due on or before January 29, 2018. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 11/21 3:20 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/13 2:31 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File20 . Based upon the stipulation of the parties, and for cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including November 20, 2017, in which to prepare and file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's cross-motion is due by December 20, 2017. (hr) |
|
20 | 20
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/13 1:27 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/19 11:04 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File18 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including October 10, 2017, in which to prepare and file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's cross-motion is due by November 9, 2017. (dml) |
|
18 | 18
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 09/19 9:44 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Fri 07/07 3:09 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File16 . Plaintiff's deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ("Plaintiff's Motion") is extended to September 4, 2017. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment remains due within thirty (30) days of service of Plaintiff's Motion. (hr) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/06 7:38 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 06/05 8:53 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF ELIZABETH ANN GRIMES (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/05 8:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV17-499 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 2:37 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Mon 04/10 10:38 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Mon 04/10 10:36 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/6/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration 1 | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 9:57 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 03/23 10:01 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: (1) Electronic Filing (see order for instructions) (2) Service of Summons and Complaint-Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint on defendant w/in 30 days of the date of this Order (3) Defendants Pleading to the Complaint-Defendants time to plead electronically is 60 days after service of the complaint (4) Waiver of Pre trial Proceedings-(see Order for information) (5) Cross Motions for Summary Judgment or Remand-Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand w/in 30 days of service of defendants answer. Defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand w/in 30 days of service of plaintiffs motion. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (dml) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/23 9:55 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 7:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 8:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes, (Rosales, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 8:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 8:40 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 8:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 8:37 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Grimes. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Elizabeth Ann Grimes(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) |