Abigail Diaz v. J.C. Management, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00500 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
J.C. Management, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Paul Carter
|
|
Plaintiff
Abigail Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 11/28 10:47 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Staying Action Pending Final Settlement and Removing Case From Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On November 20, 2017, counsel for plaitniff filed a "Notice of Settlement"20 . The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by January 5, 2018. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Settlement
Mon 11/20 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Abigail Diaz. (Au, Roland) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Tue 11/07 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for November 27, 2017.(Carter, Paul) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Fri 11/03 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for November 27, 2017.(Carter, Paul) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/26 3:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue16 . ( Discovery cut-off 2/28/2018., Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford., Jury Trial set for 5/22/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) See Order for other deadlines. (twdb) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Continue
Mon 10/23 4:39 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from January 30, 2018 to May 21, 2018 filed by defendant J.C. Management, Inc.(Chen, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Peter C.L. Chen in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Disclosure
Wed 09/13 2:28 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant J.C. Management, Inc (Chen, Peter) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Thu 06/29 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Paul Carter has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/02 4:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Abigail Diaz, upon Defendant J.C. Management, Inc served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniela Santana, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Au, Roland) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/02 2:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant J.C. Management, Inc.(Kirkpatrick, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/04 5:15 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 2, 2017 filed by Defendant J.C. Management, Inc.(Attorney Cheryl A Kirkpatrick added to party J.C. Management, Inc(pty:dft))(Kirkpatrick, Cheryl) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 04/18 3:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES (lb) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 04/18 3:56 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held: Discovery cut-off 10/30/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2018 at 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2018 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lb) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/27 9:56 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/17/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mt) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 8:04 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant J.C. Management, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 8:00 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABIGAIL DIAZ, (Au, Roland) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABIGAIL DIAZ. (Au, Roland) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 9:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff ABIGAIL DIAZ. (Au, Roland) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 9:58 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19545781 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABIGAIL DIAZ. (Attorney Roland Au added to party ABIGAIL DIAZ(pty:pla))(Au, Roland) |