Robert Breuder v. Kathy Hamilton, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-09323
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01577 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 18, 2018 3:36 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
KATHY HAMILTON, in her official and individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DEANNE M. MAZZOCHI, in her official and individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
FRANK NAPOLITANO, in his official and individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
CHARLES BERNSTEIN, in his official and individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROBERT L. BREUDER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2018 3:30 AM CDT |
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Charles Bernstein, Kathy Hamilton, Deanne M. Mazzochi and Frank Napolitano by 03/24/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 04/03/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/01/2017 for Charles Bernstein, Kathy Hamilton, Deanne M. Mazzochi and Frank Napolitano. [1] [6827024] 17-1577 (CD) | |
2 | 2 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellant represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellants are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellant's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [6827141] DW [2] [6827141] 17-1577 (CD) |