Rothe et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa G Wood |
Referred: | R Stan Baker |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00032 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2017 |
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
FCA US LLC
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FIAT Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
|
Defendant
Robert Bosch GMBH
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
|
Defendant
Robert Bosch LLC
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Plaster
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirt Rothe
Terminated: 04/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 04/17 2:20 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re1 Class Action Complaint filed by Kirt Rothe, Catherine Plaster. Assigned to the Honorable Edward M. Chen. MDL No. 2777. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffrey N. Luthi on 4/17/2017. (ca) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Mon 04/17 2:34 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of California. MDL No. 2777. File Transferred Electronically. (ca) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stay
Fri 04/14 10:07 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Entry of Conditional Transfer Order in Multidistrict Litigation by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 4/28/2017.(Owens, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Robert Bosch, LLC consent, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order for Stay of Proceedings | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 04/14 10:21 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Entry of Conditional Transfer Order in Multidistrict Litigation. (ca) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 03/27 4:19 PM
TEXT ORDER granting5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel K. Bryson. John D. Hafemann has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on March 27, 2017. (pmh) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Mon 03/27 1:26 PM
***Proposed Order for Doc5 . (Hafemann, John) Modified on 3/27/2017 (ca) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/27 1:24 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dan Bryson Receipt Number 113J-2136552, Fee Amount $200, by Catherine Plaster, Kirt Rothe. Responses due by 4/10/2017.(Hafemann, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 03/27 1:59 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dan Bryson Receipt Number 113J-2136552, Fee Amount $200. (ca) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/21 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint, Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/4/2017. (ca) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 03/21 9:19 AM
RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/21/2017. (ca) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 9:18 AM
Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC, FIAT Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Robert Bosch GMBH, Robert Bosch LLC. (ca) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 9:15 AM
Class Action COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kirt Rothe, Catherine Plaster.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 03/21 9:16 AM
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2133110. (ca) |