Castillo v. HireRight, LLC
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph S Van Bokkelen |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00124 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
HireRight, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Castillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Mon 07/31 5:14 PM
CASE DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (der) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Tue 07/25 5:30 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Carlos Castillo. (Goodwin, Tara) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/07 3:39 PM
ORDER re16 Notice of Settlement filed by Carlos Castillo. Dismissal Papers due by 9/8/2017. Text entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/7/2017. (smb) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 07/06 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Carlos Castillo (Goodwin, Tara) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Mon 06/19 2:48 PM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held by teleph 6/15/2017 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty James Latturner. Dft appeared by atty Chad Kaldor. All dates/ddl in Joint Report filed at13 through close of discovery are approved and adopted herein. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 8/14/2017 by Pla, and 8/28/2017 by defense. Discovery deadline is 12/22/2017. Expert Discovery deadline is 12/22/2017. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 9/27/2017. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 10/27/2017. Supplemental expert disclosures and reports due by 11/17/2017. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/30/2017. Mediation to be completed by close of discovery. Mediation status report due by 8/14/2017 to included a named mediator. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 7/6/2017. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. (#FTR.) (smb) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/13 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James O Latturner on behalf of Carlos Castillo (Latturner, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Wed 06/07 12:48 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kaldor, Chad) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J Kaldor on behalf of HireRight, LLC (Kaldor, Chad) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Wed 05/03 12:55 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/03 12:54 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 6/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/3/2017. (smb) Modified on 5/3/2017 to correct discovery plan due date to 6/9/2017 (smb) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/02 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Castillo. HireRight, LLC served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (Goodwin, Tara) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/01 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HireRight, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Corporate Risk Holdings LLC for HireRight, LLC.. (Mosby, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/01 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by HireRight, LLC.(Mosby, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/01 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Mosby on behalf of HireRight, LLC (Mosby, Brian) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 04/07 2:27 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/7/2017. (smb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 10:03 AM
Summons Issued as to HireRight, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/23 9:54 AM
Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (nal) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/21 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A Edelman on behalf of Carlos Castillo (Edelman, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/21 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L Goodwin on behalf of Carlos Castillo (Goodwin, Tara) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against HireRight, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3200227.), filed by Carlos Castillo.(Goodwin, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons as to HireRight, LLC |