Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. William A. Schroeder
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02064 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
William A Schroeder
|
|
Plaintiff
Central Illinois Builders Industry Advancement Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Laborers' Annuity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Laborers' Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Laborers' Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laborers' Local 477
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' District Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' Vacation Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/13 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/13/2017. Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice4 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated. (DS, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/11 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Central Illinois Builders Industry Advancement Fund, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund, Laborers' Local 477, Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' District Council, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to William A Schroeder and mailed to the attorney for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interest
Tue 03/21 10:32 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Central Illinois Builders Industry Advancement Fund, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund, Laborers' Local 477, Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' District Council, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' Vacation Fund. (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Tue 03/21 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against William A. Schroeder d/b/a Was Con Co. and Was Concrete Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2533235.), filed by Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Illinois Builders Industry Advancement Fund, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' District Council, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Southern & Central Illinois Laborers' Vacation Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Apprenticeship Training Trust Fund, Laborers' Local 477, Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust.(Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Summons |