Shipley et al v. Monsanto Company
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger |
Referred: | Helen C Adams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00006 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1407pl MDL: Products Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph E Shipley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Shipley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/05 4:27 PM
Certified Conditional Transfer Order 13 by clerk's office, Northern District of California. (don, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/05 1:31 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-13) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in IAS/1:17-cv-00006, 112 in MDL No. 2741) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/5/2017. (don, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/05 1:29 PM
TEXT MINUTE ORDER Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) Finalized on 4/5/17. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/1:17-cv-00006, 115 in MDL No. 2741).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/5/2017 (don, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/05 4:30 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (don, ) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Mon 03/27 10:06 AM
Letter to MDL Panel regarding potential tag-along action. Paperwork emailed to the MDL Panel. (don, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/27/2017) (don, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon against Monsanto Company Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3162117., filed by Joseph E Shipley, Margaret Shipley. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/19/2017. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/20/2017.(Galligan, Brian) |