Ramos v. Le et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02307 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
La Rouge Properties
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Le
|
|
Plaintiff
Raul-Alejandro Ramos
8400 Oleander Street
New Orleans, LA 70118 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/24 7:57 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/23/2017.(mmv) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to La Rouge Properties, Andrew Le. (Sms, CC Pauper Order and Pauper Letter mailed to plaintiff) (my) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 4:25 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/21/2017. (my) (my) |
|
Att: 1 (3/21/2017) Pauper Letter | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 11:12 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raul-Alejandro Ramos. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mmv) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against La Rouge Properties, Andrew Le filed by Raul-Alejandro Ramos.(mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |