Lublin et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02326 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Lublin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Lublin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/27 3:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:22 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson and Johnson Company. (am) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 12:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6036964) filed by George Lublin and Arlene Lublin.Attorney Les Weisbrod added to party George Lublin and Arlene Lublin(pty:pla).(Weisbrod, Les) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |