Wilson v. Ace American Insurance Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00427 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Patrick W Aaron, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ace American Insurance Co
|
|
Defendant
Carrie M Benfield
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Werner Enterprises Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taurein D Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Remand (Form Included)
Mon 07/24 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 27th Judicial District Court for St. Landry Parish. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
29 | 29
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/24 3:43 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING28 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the8 Motion to Remand is GRANTED and that this case is hereby remanded to the 27th Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. Landry, State of Louisiana; and that the10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/24/17. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/30 3:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: This Court recommends that8 MOTION to Remand filed by Taurein D Wilson, be granted and10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Patrick W Aaron, Jr be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/30/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel
Tue 06/20 1:14 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Enroll Blake David as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/20/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Enroll as Counsel
Mon 06/19 3:23 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Blake R. David to Enroll as Counsel by Taurein D Wilson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(Attorney Blake Rossi David added to party Taurein D Wilson(pty:pla))(aty,David, Blake) Modified on 6/19/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Thu 06/15 10:38 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re18 Notice of Motion Setting,the June 21, 2017 hearing with oral argument regarding the motion pending in this matter is CANCELLED. The Court will consider the motion on the parties' briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/15/2017. (crt,Hays, F) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 05/18 2:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand filed by Taurein D Wilson. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 05/18 2:32 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/18/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
utility
Motions Transferred
Thu 05/18 10:48 AM
Motions Transferred regarding20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent . Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) |
||
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Fri 05/19 7:53 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding24 Reply to Response to Motion. Action taken: modified docket entry to correctly reflect pleadings submitted. (crt,Chicola, C) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Corrective Document
Wed 05/17 4:49 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrective - Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Taurein D Wilson regarding20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent. (aty,Gee, William) Modified docket text to reflect proposed document on 5/17/2017 (Bunting, M) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 05/17 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to William N Gee, III on behalf of Taurein D Wilson regarding20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent. Reason: This reply brief exceeds 6 pages. Please Notice of Motion Setting for Magistrate Judge White (document 9) for information regarding length of reply briefs. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 05/17 9:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Taurein D Wilson.(aty,Gee, William) Modified docket text and to reflect deficient status on 5/17/2017 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 5/17/2017 (Bunting, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/10 11:29 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand filed by Carrie M Benfield, Werner Enterprises Inc. (aty,Aucoin, Ralph) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Tue 05/09 7:40 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 6/21/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 05/08 10:25 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys Angelique Patrice Provenzano-Walgamotte; Nichole Laborde Romero; Holli Kathleen Yandle; W Brett Cain and Tracy L Oakley terminated. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/5/2017. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 05/08 10:05 AM
MINUTE ENTRY/ORDER REFERRING MOTION:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana, Patrick W Aaron, Jr Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/5/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/04 8:07 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion day set for 6/23/2017 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Bunting, M) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/03 4:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Taurein D Wilson. (aty,Gee, William) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 05/03 3:31 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Tracy L. Oakley and Angelique P. Provenzano-Walgamotte and Nichole Laborde Romero and Holli K. Yandle and W. Brett Cain as Attorney by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana.(aty,Landry, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Tue 05/02 10:05 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Rebecca F Doherty. Motion day set for 6/23/2017 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Fri 04/21 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 2:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana. (aty,Landry, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 04/21 2:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patrick W Aaron, Jr, Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana.(Attorney Michael W Landry added to party Patrick W Aaron, Jr(pty:dft))(aty,Landry, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Wed 04/19 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding:8 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 6/21/2017 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Remand
Wed 04/19 9:28 AM
MOTION to Remand by Taurein D Wilson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Gee, William) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief MEMORANDUM IN SPPORT, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit LSBA-RPCC OPIN 08-RPCC-016, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit RETURN OF SERVICE | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/29 1:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana filed in Case No. 17-c-0849-A, 27th JDC, Parish of St. Landry, on 3/2/2017. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to5 Amended Document.(Attorney Michael W Landry added to party Safeway Insurance Co of Louisiana(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/27 4:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Werner Enterprises Inc. (aty,Aucoin, Ralph) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 03/27 4:39 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carrie M Benfield, Werner Enterprises Inc. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal,,, (Amended List of Pleadings) .(aty,Aucoin, Ralph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 5 | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Removal Order
Wed 03/22 12:02 PM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/22/2017. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 03/22 10:10 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 03/22 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Guy D Perrier, Ralph J Aucoin, Jr on behalf of Werner Enterprises Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/5/2017. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/21 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC, St. Landry Parish, Case Number 17-C-0849-A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3320237) filed by Carrie M. Benfield, Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Attorney Ralph J Aucoin, Jr added to party Carrie M. Benfield(pty:dft), Attorney Ralph J Aucoin, Jr added to party Werner Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Aucoin, Ralph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Verification, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Filing, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G-Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 11 List of Parties, | ||
Att: 12 List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 1-List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 2-List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 3-List of Pleadings | ||
transfer
Divisional Transfer
Tue 03/21 4:09 PM
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:17-cv-427 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:17-cv-427. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/22 9:45 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M) |