Gentry v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Howard F Sachs |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing
1200 N. 7th Street
Harrisburg, PA 17102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Gentry
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Terminated: 06/29/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Terminated: 06/29/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 12/04 2:36 PM
Order of Dismissal. This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 12/4/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/27 1:11 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by Brian Gentry. (Molner, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 08/08 4:49 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Brian Gentry (Molner, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 07/10 11:36 AM
ORDER granting27 motion for protective order. Signed on 7/10/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/06 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing.(Holzhueter, Kersten) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Thu 07/06 10:10 AM
Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holzhueter, Kersten) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Thu 06/29 2:27 PM
ORDER granting24 motion to dismiss party; granting25 motion to dismiss party. Signed on 6/29/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 06/28 3:39 PM
MOTION to dismiss party Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Brian Gentry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Molner, Mark) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 06/28 3:37 PM
MOTION to dismiss party JPMorgan Chase, N.A. filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Brian Gentry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Molner, Mark) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/26 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing.(Holzhueter, Kersten) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/31 1:04 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Fri 05/26 6:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Gentry.(Molner, Mark) |
|
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/26 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/14/2017. See order for additional deadlines. Signed on 5/26/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/25 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Gentry filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Gentry.(Molner, Mark) |
|
19 | 19
adr
Designation of Mediator
Thu 05/25 3:35 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Molner, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 05/23 5:30 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brian Gentry. (Molner, Mark) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Fri 05/05 2:10 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brian Gentry. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 3/3/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (Merrigan, Terence) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 05/01 3:56 PM
ORDER granting15 motion for extension of time to file dismissal. Experian's deadline to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to May 31, 2017. Signed on 5/1/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/27 2:47 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file dismissal filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Fri 04/21 1:39 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shilee Therkelsen Mullin on behalf of Defendant American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing.(Mullin, Shilee) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 1:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing.(Mullin, Shilee) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/19 9:17 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions Inc answer due 4/29/2017. Signed on 4/19/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/07 11:53 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for extension of time to answer complaint. Defendant American Education Services shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 21, 2017. Signed on April 7, 2017 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Jones, Robin) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/06 2:51 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shilee Therkelsen Mullin on behalf of American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mullin, Shilee) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/31 8:53 AM
ORDERED that the motion is granted. Defendant American Education Services shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before April 7, 2017. Signed on 3/31/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 11:01 AM
ORDER granting4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christopher A Hall for Experian Information Solutions Inc allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed [LINK:ECF Registration Form] to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) |
|
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 03/29 1:05 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/28 11:46 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne) |
|
6 | 6
order
Rule 16 Notice
Tue 03/28 10:11 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/8/2017. Signed on 3/28/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 03/27 2:58 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shilee Therkelsen Mullin on behalf of American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Shilee Therkelsen Mullin added to party American Education Services, AES Loan Servicing(pty:dft))(Mullin, Shilee) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/24 11:21 AM
Motion to allow Christopher A. Hall to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5226511) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Webb, Danne) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of MAPN
Tue 03/21 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Tue 03/21 9:59 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Webb, Danne) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/21 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, CASS COUNTY, MISSOURI County, case number 17CA-AC00234, filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-5220960.(Webb, Danne) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |