Ross v. Davis
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Referred: | Henry J Bemporad |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00222 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Thu 09/28 4:03 PM
JUDGMENT - ORDERED that Petitioner is DENIED federal habeas relief and his petition for writ of habeas corpus 2254 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg) |
|
13 | 13
11
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/28 3:41 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Carl C. Ross IS DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/16 12:10 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Issuance of Bench Warrant by Carl C. Ross.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter, | ||
Att: 2 copy of envelope | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
State Court Records
Mon 07/10 12:30 PM
State Court Records Filed.(Tadema, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 DA01_cca cover, | ||
Att: 2 DA02_docket, | ||
Att: 3 DA03_judg & opin, | ||
Att: 4 DA04_App Brief, | ||
Att: 5 DA05_states Brief, | ||
Att: 6 DA06_PD-0460-16 EXT PDR, | ||
Att: 7 DA07_PD-0460-16 ORIGINAL PDR, | ||
Att: 8 DA08_PD-0460-16 RETURNED TO COA COURT 9 20-2016 | ||
Att: 9 DA09_04 15-00211 CR Clerk's Record 6-29-15, | ||
Att: 10 DA10_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 1, | ||
Att: 11 DA11_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 2, | ||
Att: 12 DA12_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 3, | ||
Att: 13 DA13_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 4, | ||
Att: 14 DA14_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 5_Part1, | ||
Att: 15 DA14_04 15-00211 CR Reporter's Record 5-4-15 Vol. 5_Part2, | ||
Att: 16 SH01_WR-86,241-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 2 1-2017 | ||
Att: 17 SH02_WR-86,241-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 1-4-2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 07/10 12:25 PM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis.(Tadema, Nathan) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/12 4:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on or before July 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/12 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Tadema, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 06/12 4:10 PM
Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 7/10/2017. (rg) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/25 1:05 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Carl C. Ross. (rg) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 05/11 3:51 PM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad.(mgr) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 05/10 12:58 PM
Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500039482 (rg) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/26 11:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Court's Deficiency Order on or before May 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/26 9:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to2 Order by Carl C. Ross. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Mon 03/27 4:09 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Carl C. Ross. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rf) |
|
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Mon 03/27 4:10 PM
Per doc #2 a blank IFP form has been forwarded to Petitioner (rf) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/21 11:00 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Carl C. Ross.(fs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Copy of Envelope |