Gamble v. West Valley Hospital Partners for Health Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah M Fine |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00844 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:22 AM MST |
Defendant
Hospital Development of West Phoenix Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
West Valley Hospital Partners for Health Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Gamble
13606 W Desert Flower Drive
Goodyear, AZ 85395 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/27 7:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER: That a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal14 having been filed, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Mon 06/26 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melissa Gamble. (Harper, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/08 9:11 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melissa Gamble: Certificate of Service re: Summons/First Amended Complaint upon Hospital Development of West Phoenix Incorporated on 6/6/17. (DXD) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Thu 06/08 9:10 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melissa Gamble: Certificate of Service re: Summons/First Amended Complaint upon West Valley Hospital Partners for Health Incorporated on 6/6/17. (DXD) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/25 8:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Hospital Development of West Phoenix Incorporated, West Valley Hospital Partners for Health Incorporated.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 05/24 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Melissa Gamble. (Harper, Kevin) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 05/24 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Melissa Gamble. (Harper, Kevin) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/24 2:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Melissa Gamble.(Harper, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))
Wed 05/24 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Melissa Gamble . (Harper, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Wed 04/19 3:07 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Wed 04/19 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R Harper on behalf of Melissa Gamble. (Harper, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Mon 04/10 9:16 AM
Order that Melissa Gamble show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
3 | 3
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 04/10 8:45 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/06/2017. (REK) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/21 3:50 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX183476. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-844-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.(REW) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX183476 filed by Melissa Gamble.(REW) |