Hawk Technology Systems LLC v. Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-08057 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:35 AM MST |
Defendant
Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hawk Technology Systems LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/21 4:53 PM
ORDER granting23 Stipulation of Dismissal - This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/21/17. (LAD) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/21 2:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hawk Technology Systems LLC.(Myers, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 05/23 3:58 PM
ORDER granting21 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant shall have until June 21, 2017, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/23/17. (CLB) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Mon 05/22 4:29 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Second Request) by Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona.(Kavanagh, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 04/19 11:46 AM
ORDER granting the parties'19 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant shall have until May 22, 2017, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/19/17. (CLB) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Wed 04/19 11:02 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona.(Kavanagh, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
service
Service Executed
Wed 04/19 10:06 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hawk Technology Systems LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders upon Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona on 3/30/2017. (Kilgard, Ron) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 04/19 9:39 AM
ORDER denying16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/19/17. (CLB) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Tue 04/18 4:18 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona.(Kavanagh, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 04/18 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Joseph Kavanagh on behalf of Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona. (Kavanagh, Brandon) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service Executed
Mon 04/17 12:16 PM
NOTICE re: Service of13 Preliminary Order filed by Hawk Technology Systems LLC (Myers, Gregory) *Modified to correct event/linkage on 4/17/2017 (DXD) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 04/17 10:35 AM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/17/17. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/13 3:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 17-08057 PHX-SPL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for May 8, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
11 | 11
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Thu 04/13 3:30 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Mon 04/10 9:56 AM
Order that Hawk Technology Systems LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/28 10:26 AM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 03/28 10:26 AM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183634 as to Gregory J Myers. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/28 10:25 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gregory J Myers on behalf of Hawk Technology Systems LLC. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Thu 03/23 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Hawk Technology Systems LLC. (Kilgard, Ron) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Goodwill Industries of Northern Arizona. (LAD) |
|
5 | 5
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/21 4:00 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14039378. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-08037 PCT-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
4 | 4
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Tue 03/21 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (LAD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawk Technology Systems LLC. (Submitted by Ron Kilgard) (LAD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 03/21 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Hawk Technology Systems LLC. (Submitted by Ron Kilgard) (LAD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14039378 filed by Hawk Technology Systems LLC. (Submitted by Ron Kilgard) (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |