In re: Jose R. Solano
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02158 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Debtor
Jose R. Solano
1330 Bently Court
West Covina, CA 91791 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose R. Solano
1330 Bently Court
West Covina, CA 91791 |
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 04/18 9:18 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals33 , CCA # 17-56393 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered March 23, 2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum36 DISMISSED.] (mat) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 03/26 7:12 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,33 filed by Jose R. Solano. CCA # 17-56393 We dismiss for lack of appellate jurisdiction. We lack jurisdiction over this appeal because orders denying motions for withdrawal of reference are... not final appealable orders. Abney v. Kissel Co. (In re Kissel Co.), 105 F.3d 1324, 1325 (9th Cir. 1997) (order). DISMISSED. (car) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fees Paid
Fri 10/13 12:02 PM
APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,33 as to Plaintiff Jose R. Solano; Receipt Number: LA161726 in the amount of $505. (lt) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 10/06 9:55 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56393 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals33 as to Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (jp) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV)
Fri 09/15 4:41 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Jose R. Solano, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,33 (mat) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Fri 09/15 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano. Appeal of Order on Motion for Relief32 , Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision, Terminated Case27 Filed On: 6/19/17 and 8/21/17; Entered On: 6/19/17 and 8/21/17; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Relief
Mon 08/21 8:20 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT29 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Motion for Relief from JudgmentPursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) is denied. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/03 4:08 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Judgment re Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference26 , Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision, Terminated Case27 29 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA.(Dailey, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 07/20 2:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: BRIEFING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Appellee's opposition to the Motion for Relief from Judgment29 is due no later than 8/3/2017; reply by 8/10/2017. (vdr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Relief
Tue 07/18 1:12 PM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment26 filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (lom) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/19 10:29 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: The action is dismissed without prejudice. *See separate Minute Order in Chambers26 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (cw) |
|
26 | 26
order
Withdraw Reference
Mon 06/19 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: For the reasons stated herein, the Amended Motion to Withdraw Reference15 is DENIED. The action is dismissed without prejudice. (cw) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/26 1:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Amended Motion for Withdrawal Reference15 is taken off the 6/1/2017 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/1/2017. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Mon 05/22 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Response23 was issued on the wrong case. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response
Fri 05/19 5:33 PM
RESPONSE to (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Re: Want of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (jp) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Response
Fri 05/19 5:31 PM
RESPONSE to Doc19 Opposition to Motion for Mandatory Withdrawal of Reference filed May 11, 2017 by Wells Fargo Bank, NA., filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano (jp) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/11 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA, identifying Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Dailey, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
20 | 20
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 05/11 3:21 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Opposition to Motion for Mandatory Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA.(Dailey, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A through J, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
19 | 19
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 05/11 3:16 PM
OPPOSITION to Motion for Mandatory Withdrawal of Reference re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Reference as to 2:16-bk-26833-VZ, 2:17-ap-01202-VZ15 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA.(Attorney Steven M Dailey added to party Wells Fargo Bank, NA(pty:dft))(Dailey, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Mon 04/24 12:40 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Re: Briefing re Motion to Withdraw Reference by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) The hearing on plaintiff's Motion, which is currently set for 4/27/2017, is continued to 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM. (2) Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA shall file an opposition no later than 5/11/2017. (3) Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 5/18/2017. (jp) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 04/24 10:28 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano, re AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION for Withdraw Reference as to 2:16-bk-26833-VZ, 2:17-ap-01202-VZ15 served on 4/21/2017. (jp) |
|
16 | 16
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 04/24 9:47 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano, re Notice of Motion for Withdraw of Reference1 served on 4/21/2017. (jp) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw Reference
Mon 04/24 9:45 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION for Withdraw Reference as to 2:16-bk-26833-VZ, 2:17-ap-01202-VZ filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (jp) (jp) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2017) Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O
Wed 04/19 10:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin DENYING APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing12 . (jp) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5
Mon 04/17 12:16 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (lom) |
|
11 | 11
order
Entry of Default Withdraw
Fri 04/14 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: For the reasons stated herein, the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference1 is denied without prejudice; the Application for Entry of Default7 is denied. No later than April 21, 2017, Jose Solano shall re-file and serve the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. *See Order for details.* (cw) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Thu 04/13 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Entry of Default against defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA7 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 04/13 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano, re APPLICATION for Entry of Default7 , Declaration in support of Application for Entry of Default8 , served on 4/12/2017. (jp) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 04/13 1:12 PM
DECLARATION in support of Application for Entry of Default against defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA7 filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (jp) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Default
Thu 04/13 1:09 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default against defendant Wells Fargo Bank, NA filed by plaintiff Jose R. Solano. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Fri 03/24 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference1 . Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for briefing schedule.* (vdr) |
|
5 | 5
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/24 11:31 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Thu 03/23 9:04 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as LACV 17-02158 FMO. (dv) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 04/17 12:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE re Motion to Withdraw1 by first class mail to Mark D Estele and Erica Loftis on 3/20/17 filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (lom) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 3:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy Matter Referral (CV-70) - Proposed Order Forwarded to Judge
Tue 03/21 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Complaint)
Tue 03/21 2:54 PM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Reference from U.S. Bankruptcy Court assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:16-bk-26833-VZ, Adversary number: 2:17-ap-01202-VZ (Filing fee$150 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Jose R. Solano. (esa) |