Ana S. Garcia v. FCA US LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02198 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana S. Garcia
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Crown Dodge
Terminated: 03/21/2017
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
56 | 56
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 08/20 3:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. re Stipulation to Dismiss Case55 . (vm) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
55 | 55
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/14 12:19 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Ana S. Garcia.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |