Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper v. Wiggins Lift Co., Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02204 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1319 Clean Water Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Wiggins Lift Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Interested Party
United States Department of Justice
Environment and Natural Resources Division Law and Policy Section Ben Franklin Station P.O. Box 7415
Washington, DC 20044 |
|
Plaintiff
Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
judgmentCV
Judgment - Consent
Fri 05/19 11:16 AM
CONSENT DECREE by Judge George H. Wu: 1. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this action; 2. Venue is appropriate in the Central District Court because the Facility at which the alleged violations took place is located within this District; 3. The Complaint and First Amended Complaint states claims upon which relief may be granted against Defendant; 4. Plaintiffs have standing to bring this action. Defendant agrees to make a payment of Five Thousand Dollars ($5,000) to be received within thirty (30) days of the Effective Date to the Rose Foundation for Communities and the Environment for a project related to water quality designed to analyze, reduce, prevent, or otherwise mitigate the ecological effects of stormwater and/or non-stormwater discharges to the Santa Clara River. Defendant agrees to reimburse Plaintiffs for their investigation fees and costs, consultant fees and costs, reasonable attorneys' fees, and other costs incurred as a result of investigating and filing the lawsuit, and negotiating a resolution of this matter in an amount totaling Twenty Four Thousand Dollars ($24,000). See attached document for details. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lom) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Fri 05/19 9:28 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONSENT DECREE - BY TELEPHONE Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Parties do not object to the Proposed Consent Decree. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/17 11:21 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically at the order to show cause hearing set for 05/18/2017 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Settlement
Mon 05/15 4:09 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Settlement and Entry of Consent Decree filed by Joint Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper.(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 05/12 2:25 PM
Statement of Interest of the United States and Comment on Proposed Consent Decree(Ennis, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/26 2:05 PM
ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE RE: [PROPOSED] CONSENT DECREE by Judge George H. Wu. NOW THEREFORE, GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, IT IS HEREBYORDERED THAT: The Order to Show Cause re: Entry of the [Proposed] Consent Decree is continued to May 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. All other Court orders remain in effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jy) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Continue
Mon 04/24 9:48 AM
STIPULATION to Continue OSC re Consent Decree from 5/8/17 to 5/19/17 or thereafter Re: Order to Show Cause,9 filed by Joint Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper.(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 04/04 12:28 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/27 10:05 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING [PROPOSED] CONSENT DECREEby Judge George H. Wu. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. An Order to Show Cause re: Submission of the [Proposed] Consent Decree for the Court's consideration and approval is set for May 8, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.; 2. The Order to Show Cause will be discharged if the [Proposed] Consent Decree is filed before the appearance; and 3. All other deadlines are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Settlement
Wed 03/22 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Jointly Filed Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper.(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 1:36 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Wiggins Lift Co., Inc. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 1:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper, (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 3:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 3:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Kracov, Gideon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19552251 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper. (Attorney Gideon Kracov added to party Wishtoyo Foundation Ventura Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Kracov, Gideon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |