Estate of Paul Richard Wilson
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00522 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Estate Plaintiff
Paul Richard Wilson
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Paul Richard Wilson
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 04/26 12:14 PM
ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSING CASE by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report filed April 24, 2017, informing the Court that the issues involved in this matter have concluded. Upon the parties' request, the above-entitled action is hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk's Office is directed to close this case (JS-6). IT IS SO ORDERED. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (clee) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report
Mon 04/24 4:01 PM
JOINT REPORT of STATUS filed by Defendant United States of America. (Whittlesey, Brent) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/19 2:48 PM
TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real. Counsel are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding the status of the case as it stands now, on or before APRIL 26, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/19 2:34 PM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Manuel L. Real. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-00522 R (DTBx). (jtil) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 11:02 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Brent A Whittlesey. (Whittlesey, Brent) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court - Riverside, CA, case number RIP 1004189 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Brent A Whittlesey. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party Brent A Whittlesey(pty:dft))(Whittlesey, Brent) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |