Dr. Tina Kokkinis v. Bruce Harold Boyd
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00511 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bruce Harold Boyd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
BG Real Estate Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Peggy Louise Dace
|
|
Defendant
Newport Pelican Group Inc
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Laurel R Zaeske
|
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Tina Kokkinis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
62 | 62
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/21 10:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE61 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (es) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
61 | 61
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 12/20 4:10 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to agreement by the parties filed by Plaintiff Tina Kokkinis.(Lanza, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |