(HC) Fadden v. Vasquez
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony W Ishii |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00398 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Petitioner
Barrett Juston Fadden
|
|
Respondent
Pat L. Vasquez
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Thu 01/18 12:53 PM
JUDGMENT dated *1/18/2018* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 01/18 12:52 PM
ORDER adopting24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/17/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 01/18 12:53 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:27 Judgment,26 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Thu 10/05 9:40 AM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS24 by Petitioner Barrett Juston Fadden. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 08/29 3:59 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION That Court Deny Petitioner's Motion to Amend and Grant Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition14 ,19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/29/17: 30-Day Deadline . (Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 08/29 4:00 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:24 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Hellings, J) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Reply
Thu 08/24 1:27 PM
REPLY by Pat L. Vasquez re22 Opposition. Attorney Krenzin, Tami M. added.(Krenzin, Tami) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Opposition
Thu 08/17 2:33 PM
OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss by Petitioner Barrett Juston Fadden. (Flores, E) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Fri 08/04 10:42 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of State Court Record re21 Notice of Lodging. (Jessen, A) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper
Wed 08/02 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Pat L. Vasquez: Documents in Support of Motion to Dismiss.(Riley, Justain) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 07/31 4:45 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to Lodge Documents as to14 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/312/17. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 07/31 4:46 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:20 Order, served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Martin-Gill, S) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Amend the Complaint/Petition
Tue 07/25 12:27 PM
MOTION to AMEND the5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Barrett Juston Fadden. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Mon 07/17 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANITNG Petitioner's17 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/17. 30-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 07/17 1:25 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:18 Order on Motion for Extension served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/10 3:18 PM
MOTION for 30-60 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Barrett Juston Fadden. (Marrujo, C) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/10 3:17 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Barrett Juston Fadden. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 06/26 8:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only): This case is assigned to U.S. District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; the new case number is 1:17-cv-00398-AWI-SKO(HC). (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 06/26 8:27 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Docket Annotation served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/23 3:29 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Pat L. Vasquez.(Riley, Justain) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
13 | 13
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/23 11:47 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Pat L. Vasquez. Attorney Riley, Justain Paul added.(Riley, Justain) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/24 10:47 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Barrett Juston Fadden. (Jessen, A) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Mon 05/08 8:13 AM
SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/8/2017. Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days . (Jessen, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 05/08 8:14 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:11 Second Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Jessen, A) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Document(s) Served Electronically
Mon 05/01 8:19 AM
DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Michael Farrell. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
9 | 9
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Mon 05/01 8:18 AM
RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
8 | 8
order
06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response
Mon 05/01 8:17 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/28/2017. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 7/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Mon 05/01 8:14 AM
ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's6 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 05/01 8:17 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/27 11:39 AM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Submit Petition for Habeas Corpus Due to Extraordinary Circumstances not the Fault of Petitioner by Barrett Juston Fadden. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/27 11:38 AM
FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Barrett Juston Fadden.(Sant Agata, S) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend
Thu 03/23 3:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/17: 30-Day Deadline .(Hellings, J) |
|
Att: 1 2254 Petition - blank form | ||
service
Service by Mail
Thu 03/23 3:42 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order Dismissing Petition with Leave to Amend served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Hellings, J) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP
Tue 03/21 11:00 AM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Barrett Juston Fadden, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/17. (Hellings, J) |
|
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/21 10:59 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/24/2017. (Hellings, J) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/21 11:01 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:1 Petition,2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Barrett Juston Fadden. (Hellings, J) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/21 10:57 AM
(2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Pat L. Vasquez, by Barrett Juston Fadden.(Hellings, J) |