Vidrio v. Rash Curtis & Associates
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Erica P Grosjean |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rash Curtis & Associates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Vidrio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 04/17 9:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re18 Judgment : Please DISREGARD Judgment entered on 4/17/18. Entered in error. (Marrujo, C) |
|
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Tue 04/17 9:17 AM
***DISREGARD*** JUDGMENT dated *4/17/2018* pursuant to order (Marrujo, C) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/17 9:08 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/16/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/13 12:38 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFF AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PUTATIVE CLASS by Amy Vidrio.(Friedman, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to dismiss | ||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/15 2:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation for an extension of time to 4/16/2018 for filing dispositional documents. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/15/2018. (Rooney, M) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/14 12:41 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to file dismissal re12 Notice of Settlement by Amy Vidrio. Attorney Bacon, Adrian R. added.(Bacon, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to extend time | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 01/09 2:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) As a Notice of Settlement has been filed, document12 , the Court VACATES any and all deadlines and hearings currently pending before the Court. The Court further DIRECTS the parties to file the appropriate dismissal documents no later than 3/15/2018. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2018. (Rooney, M) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/09 8:16 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Amy Vidrio. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 08/25 8:52 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Mark E. Ellis. (Ellis, Mark) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/10 9:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Plaintiff's Merits and Class Certification Discovery due by 3/2/2018; Class Certification Motion Filing and Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/30/2018; Opposition to Class Certification Motion Filing and Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 4/27/2018; Reply to Class Certification Motion Filing due by 5/11/2018; Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2018; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/14/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Jury Trial set for 6/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean (4-6 day estimate). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/9/2017. (Rooney, M) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Fri 07/28 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The parties have filed their consents under Title 28, U.S.C. section 636(c)(1), to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment. Accordingly, the above-entitled action is assigned to Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean as Presiding Judge for all purposes. All future pleadings shall be numbered 1:17-CV-00407-EPG . Minute Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. ONeill. (Rooney, M) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/27 12:32 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rash Curtis & Associates. Attorney Castro, David Elias added. (Castro, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/25 12:28 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held, in chambers and off the record, on 7/25/2017 with an order to follow. The Court directs defense counsel to file his consent/decline to magistrate judge jurisdiction form by the close of business on 7/27/2017. Plaintiff's Counsel Thomas Wheeler telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel David Castro telephonically present. (Rooney, M) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Report
Tue 07/18 6:23 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Amy Vidrio. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 5:25 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Rash Curtis & Associates. Attorney Ellis, Mark E. added.(Ellis, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/03 8:41 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Amy Vidrio. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Tue 03/21 3:47 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hellings, J) |
|
Att: 1 EPG Sched Conf, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 03/21 3:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rash Curtis & Associates* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Hellings, J) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Rash Curtis & Associates by Amy Vidrio. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6969985)(Friedman, Todd) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |