River City Media, LLC et al v. Kromtech Alliance Corporation et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley A Bastian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00105 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:2701 Violation of Stored Electronic Communications Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kromtech Alliance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Ragan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris Vickery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CXO Media Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-50
|
|
Defendant
International Data Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Ferris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Ferris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Paul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
River City Media LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
118 | 118
2
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Closed
Tue 09/04 12:02 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE; CLOSING FILE. ACCEPTING and ENTERING into the record117 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
117 | 117
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/31 9:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Ferris, Matt Ferris, Amber Paul, River City Media LLC. (Bernstein, Jason) |