Walker v. Fleites et al (CONSENT)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | David A Baker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00158 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
FAF, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mario Fleites
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GEICO General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Walker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Thu 06/07 12:13 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT, the parties having filed a 37 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs; directing the Clerk to enter this document in the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 6/7/18.. Furnished to calendar group and All MJ CRDs (terminates Jury Trial 06/11/2018).(djy, ) |
|
Att: 1 civil appeals checklist | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/04 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites. (Simms, Keri) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/09 1:46 PM
STATUS REPORT by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites. (Simms, Keri) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Cancelling Deadline ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 02/22 12:57 PM
ORDER: This matter is currently set for a pretrial conference on 3/1/2018, with all discovery to be completed on or before 4/2/2018. It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report within seven days upon the completion of discovery indicating their positions regarding mediation. The pretrial conference is CANCELLED, to be rescheduled following receipt of the parties status report. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 2/22/2018. Copies furnished to calendar group, All MJ CRD's.(dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 02/07 1:22 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court following the telephone conference call held on 2/6/2018. Upon consideration, the Court ORDERS as follows. Thismatter is set for a Jury Trial commencing on 6/11/2018 in Opelika, Alabama before Honorable Judge David A. Baker. All discovery in this matter shall be completed on or before 4/2/2018. The parties shall file a status report upon the completion of discovery indicating their positions regarding mediation. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 2/6/2018. Copies furnished to calendar group, All MJ CRD's.(dmn, ) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Non-Compliance
Wed 02/07 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re31 Notice to Take Deposition. The referenced document is discovery and is not allowed pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The document is hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of this document on the court's docket. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 02/13 11:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge David A. Baker: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2018 (PDF available for court use only). (ws, ) |
|
31 | 31
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 02/06 10:27 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mario Fleites by Stanley Walker.(Alexander, Anastasia) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/23 2:28 PM
ORDER: This matter is currently scheduled for a Jury Trial commencing on 4/16/2018 in Opelika, AL before Honorable David A. Baker (Doc. 18 ). A telephone conference is set for Tuesday, 2/6/2018, at 9:00 AM before Honorable Judge David A. Baker. Each party must be represented by at least one attorney of record and lead counsel should participate if possible. Counsel are directd to call 334-954-3275 and use passcode 246860 to join the telephone conference. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all aspects of this case including any pending motions. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 1/23/2018. Copies furnished to calendar group, All MJ CRD's.(dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 12:09 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court following Defendants response (Doc. 28 ) to the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 27 ). Upon consideration, it is hereby ORDERED the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 27 ) is discharged. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 1/16/2018. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respoth
Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/11 2:33 PM
Reply to response to order to show cause filed by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites.(Simms, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
6
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 01/03 4:43 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Dft in writing, within 14 days of the date of this Order, why the case should not be remanded for absence of jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 1/3/2018. (wcl, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 12/20 10:25 AM
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge David A. Baker. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 12/07 9:44 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
trial
Witness List
Wed 11/15 2:30 PM
Witness List by Stanley Walker. (Alexander, Anastasia) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Answer to Interrogatories
Wed 09/27 12:38 PM
ANSWER to Interrogatories from Stanley Walker by Stanley Walker.(Alexander, Anastasia) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Non-Compliance
Tue 08/15 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re21 Answer to Interrogatories (Notice of Service of Discovery) which has been stricken pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 regarding Non-Filing of Civil Discovery.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Local Rule 26.3 Excerpt | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
discov
Answer to Interrogatories
Mon 08/14 2:02 PM
ANSWER to Interrogatories from Defendants by Stanley Walker.(Alexander, Anastasia) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/10 3:20 PM
ORDERED that the Motion (Doc. 13 ) be and hereby is GRANTED to the extent that GEICO is permitted to opt out based upon the procedures in Lowe. It is further ORDERED that GEICO may return to active participation in this case upon a properly supported motion demonstrating that circumstances have arisen in which Lowe and its progeny would permit USAA to reenter this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/10/2017. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/30 2:16 PM
ORDERED that the Parties shall show cause on or before July 10, 2017 why the Motion (Doc. 12 ) should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/30/2017. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/28 2:31 PM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2018, 10:00 AM, in CR 4A, before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer.; Jury Trial set for 4/16/2018, in Opelika, Alabama before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer; Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2017; Mediation Notice due by 2/20/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2017; Discovery due by 2/15/2018, as futher set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/28/2017. (furn: Cb, Calendar)(kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/21 4:10 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites. (kh, ) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/21 4:09 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Stanley Walker. (kh, ) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/21 4:08 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by GEICO General Insurance Company. (kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 05/23 4:30 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simms, Keri) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/16 4:10 PM
MOTION Notice of Election to Opt Out by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Jackson, Joshua) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 05/05 8:25 AM
ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than May 24, 2017. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before May 24, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/5/2017. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Thu 04/13 8:27 AM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mario Fleites Corporate Disclosures due by 4/24/2017.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Thu 04/13 8:26 AM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stanley Walker Corporate Disclosures due by 4/24/2017.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/11 10:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites.(Simms, Keri) |
|
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 04/13 8:20 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry9 for pdf)(kh, ) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/07 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company.(Jackson, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/31 3:11 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Jackson, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/29 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for GEICO General Insurance Company. (wcl, ) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Wed 03/29 11:30 AM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to GEICO General Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/10/2017.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Joinder
Tue 03/28 9:59 AM
JOINDER re1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Jackson, Joshua) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 03/29 11:28 AM
***Attorney Joshua Jonathan Jackson for GEICO General Insurance Company added pursuant to the4 Joinder. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for FAF, Inc., Stanley Walker (kh, ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 10:53 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by FAF, Inc. (kh, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FAF, Inc. from Circuit Court of Chambers County, AL, case number CV-2017-900029.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602044646)(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Filing Fee Receipt | ||
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against FAF, Inc., Mario Fleites, GEICO General Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 1 receipt number 1.), filed by Stanley Walker.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry1 for pdf)(kh, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 03/22 10:22 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stanley Walker. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry1 for pdf)(kh, ) |