Original Case: 2:15-cv-00742

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-35231
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2017
Terminated:Aug 02, 2017
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
CHANGE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS LLC, FKA Envoy LLC
Represented By
Overton Thompson III
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Shayne Clinton
Bass Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
David Benjamin Edwards
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece LLP
contact info
Steven Walter Fogg
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHANGE HEALTHCARE OPERATIONS LLC, FKA Emdeon Business Services LLC
Represented By
Overton Thompson III
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Shayne Clinton
Bass Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
David Benjamin Edwards
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece LLP
contact info
Steven Walter Fogg
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHANGE HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS INC, FKA Emdeon Inc
Represented By
Overton Thompson III
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Shayne Clinton
Bass Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
David Benjamin Edwards
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece LLP
contact info
Steven Walter Fogg
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Preece, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARC LILLY, not in his individual capacity but as the Representative for the former shareholders of Vieosoft, Inc
Represented By
Brian McCracken Daucher
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
John E. Casperson
HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT, APC
contact info
Lafcadio Hearn Darling
HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT, APC
contact info
Abby H. Meyer
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/04/2017 1:26 AM PDT
Monday, March 20, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/27/2017. Appellant Marc Lilly opening brief due 06/26/2017. Appellees Change Healthcare Holdings Inc, Change Healthcare Operations LLC and Change Healthcare Solutions LLC answering brief due 07/25/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10362894] (KM) [Entered: 03/20/2017 10:36 AM]
Related: [-]