Garcia et al v. Gladieux
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00109 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
75 | 75
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 02/18 1:52 PM
ORDER: The parties' Joint Stipulation to Dismiss74 is SO ORDERED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party bearing its own fees and costs. The case is thereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/18/2020. (jat) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
74 | 74
motion
Dismiss
Fri 02/14 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Marco Garcia, Eugene Lallow, Joshua Mackin. (Myers, Christopher) |