Washington v. Tovo et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Rodovich |
Referred: | Andrew P Rodovich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00128 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hasmukh K. Patel
13246 Stagg Hill Drive
Carmel, IN 46033 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob J. Tovo
839 Kannal Court Apartment 1
Rensselaer, IN 47978 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Terry Austgen
|
|
Plaintiff
Sheila L. Washington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Wed 01/22 10:35 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Hasmukh K. Patel. (Hagberg, Harold) |
|
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Wed 01/22 2:48 PM
CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re40 Stipulation to Dismiss. (tc) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/26 4:15 PM
ORDER: Defendant Jacob J. Tovo is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The plaintiff's claims against Hasmukh K. Patel remain pending. The Motion to Exclude Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and F.R.E. 702 DE32 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/26/19. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/25 11:44 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Jacob J. Tovo by Defendant Jacob J. Tovo. (Vetne, J) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/22 9:59 AM
ORDER: Parties to file dismissal papers by 6/21/2019 as to defendant Jacob J. Tovo re36 Notice of Partial Settlement. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/22/2019. Text entry only. (tc) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 04/19 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Partial) by Jacob J. Tovo (Vetne, J) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/06 10:32 AM
ORDER: Court DENIES AS MOOT34 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Exclude. Pursuant to the minute entry entered on 1/24/2019 at DE 31, the Plaintiff's response is not due until 4/30/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/6/2019. Text entry only. (tc) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 03/06 9:30 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to32 MOTION to Exclude under FRCP 37 and FRE 702 by Plaintiff Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Sunday, February 24, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Brief in Support
Sun 02/24 5:07 PM
BRIEF in Support of32 MOTION to Exclude under FRCP 37 and FRE 702 filed by Jacob J. Tovo.(Vetne, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Transcript Submission Form Plaintiff's deposition | ||
32 | 32
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Sun 02/24 5:04 PM
MOTION to Exclude under FRCP 37 and FRE 702 by Defendant Jacob J. Tovo. (Vetne, J) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/24 12:52 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 1/24/2019, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared in person and by atty Daniel Zlatic. Dfts appeared by attys Thomas Vetne w/Meredith Mathos, Harold Hagberg w/Angie Morris, Locosta Sommer All State Ins Rep. Case did not settle. Atty Thomas Vetne to file a motion challenging Pltf's expert witness report by 2/28/2019. Atty Hagberg to join in by 3/15/2019. Plaintiff to file a response by 4/30/2019; any reply to be filed by 5/24/2019. Jury Trial (3-4 days) set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Proposed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, motions in limine, and Pretrial order shall be prepared and filed by 1/31/2020. (tc) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 11/09 12:11 PM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/9/2018, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Daniel Zlatic. Dfts appeared by attys Thomas Vetne, Harold Hagberg. Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2019 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Plaintiff and a representative of defendants with settlement authority must appear at the settlement conference. Please email confidential settlement statements no later than 5 days prior to Rodovich_Chambers@innd.uscourts.gov. (tc) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/18 3:30 PM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/18/2018, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Daniel Zlatic. Dfts appeared by attys Thomas Vetne, Harold Hagberg. Pltf to respond to outstanding discovery by 6/6/2018. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/6/2018. Discovery to be completed by 10/31/2018. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/9/2018 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than what is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Magistrate Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov no later than 24 hours prior to the conference. (tc) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 05/17 5:14 PM
ORDER: On the Court's own the motion, the Status Conference set for 5/18/2018 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich is converted to a TELEPHONIC Status Conference. Court to initiate the call. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/17/2018. Text entry only. (tc) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Rule 12f Motion to Strike
Wed 05/09 1:18 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Motion to Compel Expert Disclosures DE17 is GRANTED and the Motion to Strike DE21 is DENIED. The plaintiff, Sheila Washington has 14 days from the date of this Order to supplement her Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/9/18. (nal) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 02/21 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures filed by Jacob J. Tovo. (Vetne, J) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 02/21 1:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike filed by Jacob J. Tovo. (Vetne, J) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/16 3:11 PM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2018, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Daniel Zlatic. Dft appeared by atty Brian Gates. Reply to17 Motion to Compel to be filed by 3/2/2018. Response to21 Motion to Strike to be filed by 3/2/2018; reply to be filed by 3/16/2018. Status Conference set for 5/18/2018 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (tc) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/13 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R Gates on behalf of Jacob J. Tovo (Gates, Brian) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 02/08 11:20 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures filed by Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 02/07 2:03 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 02/07 2:00 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to Compel Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 02/06 12:33 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 02/05 3:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures filed by Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Compel
Tue 01/30 4:24 PM
MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures by Defendant Jacob J. Tovo.(Vetne, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 11/17 4:48 PM
ORDER: Court GRANTS15 Motion for Leave to File Supplement F.R.C.P. 26(a)2 Disclosures. Plaintiff granted up to and including 12/30/2017, to supplement her F.R.C.P. 26(a)2 disclosures. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 2/13/2018. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/17/2017. Text entry only. (tc) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 11/17 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplement F.R.C.P. 26(a)2 Disclosures by Plaintiff Sheila L. Washington. (Zlatic, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
Mon 05/08 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having orally consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2007-10 from Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich and Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (tc) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Mon 05/08 10:10 AM
|
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Mon 05/01 12:17 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rubino, Terrence) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:57 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (rmc) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Tue 04/11 10:06 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/2/2017. (tc) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/11 10:05 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2017 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/11/2017. (tc) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/10 2:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Hasmukh K. Patel.(Hagberg, Harold) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harold G Hagberg on behalf of Hasmukh K. Patel (Hagberg, Harold) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 04/06 10:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/6/2017. (tc) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 12:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jacob J. Tovo.(Vetne, J) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/05 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J Thomas Vetne on behalf of Jacob J. Tovo (Vetne, J) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Hasmukh K. Patel, Jacob J. Tovo. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/22 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M Rubino on behalf of Sheila Washington (Rubino, Terrence) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3201642.), filed by Sheila Washington.(Rubino, Terrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/22 2:27 PM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. *NEW CASE* (jss) |