C H G Hospital West Monroe v. Price
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00436 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tom Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C H G Hospital West Monroe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 09/25 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT granting11 Motion to Dismiss. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/25/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/22 11:39 AM
Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss all claims against Tom Price by C H G Hospital West Monroe. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes.(aty,Alexander, Albert) Modified on 9/22/2017 to edit text (FinnSld, P) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Fri 09/22 1:21 PM
Motions Transferred regarding11 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss all claims against Defendant. Motions referred to Judge Robert G James. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Order - Judge James
Tue 09/12 2:42 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Robert G James sent to pending counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/19/2017.. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/12/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 3:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Tom Price.(aty,Johnson, Andolyn) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 07/25 11:22 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Tom Price's answer/responsive pleading due 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/25/2017. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/24 10:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Tom Price. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(Attorney Andolyn Reeves Johnson added to party Tom Price(pty:dft))(aty,Johnson, Andolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 06/21 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by C H G Hospital West Monroe Tom Price served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (aty,Devillier, Carroll) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 06/20 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned UNExecuted by C H G Hospital West Monroe Tom Price served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (aty,Devillier, Carroll) Modified on 6/20/2017 to indicate Unexecuted(FinnSld, P) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Tue 06/20 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Carroll Devillier, Jr on behalf of C H G Hospital West Monroe regarding5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Action taken: service of the complaint on the U S A defendant is not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 06/06 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by C H G Hospital West Monroe Tom Price. (aty,Devillier, Carroll) Modified on 6/6/2017 to remove answer deadline and service executed date as to U S A (FinnSld, P) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Tue 06/06 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Carroll Devillier, Jr on behalf of C H G Hospital West Monroe regarding4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Action taken: service of the complaint on the U S A defendant is not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued - USA (Form Included)
Thu 03/23 3:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Secretary U S Dept of Health & Human Services (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 2:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C H G Hospital West Monroe. (aty,Alexander, Albert) Modified on 3/23/2017 to add Corporate Parent C H G Hospital Operations Co L L C (Dauterive, C) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF FINAL ADVERSE AGENCY DECISION REGARDING MEDICARE REIMBURSEMENT against Tom Price (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3321978) filed by CHG Hospital West Monroe.(Attorney Albert G Alec Alexander, III added to party CHG Hospital West Monroe(pty:pla))(aty,Alexander, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/23 3:19 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C) |