Wilkerson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00805 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Petitioner
Senrick Shern Wilkerson
|
|
Respondent
Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied
Mon 04/17 3:47 PM
Order Denying Certificate of Appealability. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/17/2017) |
|
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 04/17 3:45 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice to his right to file a motion for leave to file a successive 28 U.S.C. § 2254 application in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/17/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 04/17 3:34 PM
Order Accepting3 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Petitioner's Objections are OVERRULED. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/17/2017) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/17 3:47 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6, 7. Mon Apr 17 15:47:51 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 04/11 10:48 AM
OBJECTION filed by Senrick Shern Wilkerson re:3 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation on Case. (ran) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 03/23 2:35 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This construed habeas application is an unauthorized successive petition, and, given Wilkerson's history of filing such petitions, the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice to his right to seek authorization from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit to file a successive habeas application. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/23/2017) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/23 2:35 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Mar 23 14:35:57 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 03/22 1:28 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Senrick Shern Wilkerson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Kinkeade
Wed 03/22 1:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) (epm) |