Frank Rust v. Chino Prison Healthcare Providers et al
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02225 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Michael Vu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chino Prison Healthcare Providers
|
|
Defendant
L. Escobell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M. Farooq
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T. Moll
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
S. Ocegura
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Warfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank A Rust
CDC T-08468 California Institution for Men P O Box 368
Chino, CA 91708 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 10:47 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 5:17-cv-00556-JAK-KES. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 11:49 AM
NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendants Louie Escobell, Muhammad Farooq, Thomas Moll, Silvia Oceguera, Michael Vu. (Grabarsky, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Louie Escobell, Muhammad Farooq, Thomas Moll, Silvia Oceguera, Michael Vu, (Grabarsky, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1618405 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 03/22/2017, receipt number 0973-19555928), filed by Defendants Michael Vu, Muhammad Farooq, Silvia Oceguera, Louie Escobell, Thomas Moll. (Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Louie Escobell(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Muhammad Farooq(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Thomas Moll(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Silvia Oceguera(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Michael Vu(pty:dft))(Grabarsky, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 11:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Louie Escobell, Muhammad Farooq, Thomas Moll, Silvia Oceguera, Michael Vu. (Grabarsky, Todd) |