Norma Cardoza v. Target Corporation, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02232 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Frank A Silane
|
|
Plaintiff
Norma Cardoza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
52 | 52
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/15 9:23 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals35 , CCA # 18-55877 The judgment of this Court, entered April 22, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $71.30. [See USCA Memorandum51 AFFIRMED.] (mat) |